Aldino v. I.K. Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Aldino
Defendant: Rashika Sinha and I.K. Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv06772
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by I.K. Systems, Inc., Rashika Sinha. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service via mail and email 10/17/19)(Nutter, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-06781.
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Case transferred to Western District Of NY per #17 . ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 9/30/2019. A certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet mailed to USDC-WD-NY. (Layne, Monique) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue ---- For the reasons set forth in the ATTACHED WRITTEN MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint is denied and Defendants' motion to transfer venue is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of New York and to close this case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 9/30/2019. (Irizarry, Dora) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 Letter regarding stay of discovery by I.K. Systems, Inc. (O'Brien, Donald) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 Letter Requesting Discovery by Jocelyn Aldino (Allen, Rachel) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue, #13 Memorandum in Opposition Reply filed by I.K. Systems, Inc., Rashika Sinha. (O'Brien, Donald) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue filed by Jocelyn Aldino. (Allen, Rachel) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED LETTER ORDER re #11 So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/25/2019. (Caggiano, Diana) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 Letter by Rashika Sinha (O'Brien, Donald) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by I.K. Systems, Inc., Rashika Sinha. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Melissa Marcella with attached Exhibit A, #2 Declaration Rashika Sinha, #3 Memorandum in Support) (O'Brien, Donald) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 2/1/2019 @ 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/11/2019. (Caggiano, Diana) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Defendants' deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended from December 31, 2018 up to and including January 18, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/28/2018. (Zisa, Marie) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to and including January 18, 2019 by I.K. Systems, Inc., Rashika Sinha. (O'Brien, Donald) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to I.K. Systems, Inc., Rashika Sinha. (Attachments: #1 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Jocelyn Aldino (Allen, Rachel) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
November 29, 2018 NOTICE - The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Jocelyn Aldino (Allen, Rachel) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Jocelyn Aldino (Allen, Rachel) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against I.K. Systems, Inc., Rashika Sinha filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-10978920 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Jocelyn Aldino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Allen, Rachel) [Transferred from nyed on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldino v. I.K. Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashika Sinha
Represented By: Donald W. O'Brien, Jr.
Represented By: John Cobb Nutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.K. Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Donald W. O'Brien, Jr.
Represented By: John Cobb Nutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jocelyn Aldino
Represented By: Rachel Adele Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?