Thompkins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stephen Thompkins
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 6:2019cv06776
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis D. Tankard on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Tankard, Francis)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Attached issued summons and complaint served electronically on the defendant pursuant to Western District of New York's Local Rules of Civil Procedures. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JHF)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS (complete complaint with all pages) to #1 Complaint. (Fletcher, Jere) Modified on 10/21/2019 (JHF).
October 21, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
October 21, 2019 Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (JHF)
October 21, 2019 E-Filing Notification #1 COMPLAINT: Only the first page of the complaint was electronically filed by the attorney. Attorney directed to refile the entire complaint. When filing, use the CM/ECF event "Continuation of Exhibits." (JHF)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ($400 receipt number 0209-3625772), filed by Stephen Thompkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons) (Fletcher, Jere) Modified on 10/21/2019 (JHF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompkins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Thompkins
Represented By: Jere B. Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Francis D. Tankard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?