Starks v. Maximus Health Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lartha Starks
Defendant: Maximus Health Services, Inc., Joshua Nielsen and Nora Kyle
Case Number: 6:2019cv06805
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nora Kyle, Maximus Health Services, Inc., Joshua Nielsen. (Stevens, Christopher)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Joseph Cronen on behalf of Lartha Starks (Cronen, H.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting motion for extension of time to answer until January 10, 2020. Motions terminated: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Maximus Health Services, Inc., Joshua Nielsen, Nora Kyle.. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 12/9/19. (JMC)
December 9, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Nora Kyle, Maximus Health Services, Inc., Joshua Nielsen.(Stevens, Christopher)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Stevens on behalf of Nora Kyle, Joshua Nielsen (Stevens, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Stevens on behalf of Maximus Health Services, Inc. (Stevens, Christopher)
November 1, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (JHF)
November 1, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nora Kyle, Maximus Health Services, Inc., Joshua Nielsen. (JHF)
November 1, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint Proposed Summons. (Fingerhut, Steven)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet. (Fingerhut, Steven)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nora Kyle, Maximus Health Services, Inc., Joshua Nielsen $ 400 receipt number 0209-3638292, filed by Lartha Starks. (Attachments: #1 Appendix EEOC Notice of Right to Sue)(Fingerhut, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starks v. Maximus Health Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximus Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Nielsen
Represented By: Christopher J. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nora Kyle
Represented By: Christopher J. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lartha Starks
Represented By: Steven John Fingerhut
Represented By: H. Joseph Cronen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?