Reeder v. Dennis et al
Plaintiff: Ryan James Reeder
Defendant: Michael Strohm, Steven Vine, William J. Hart, A.D.A. James B. Ritts and Brian D. Dennis
Case Number: 6:2020cv06026
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Letter from Ryan James Reeder, dated 2/10/20, to Clerk. (JHF)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ryan James Reeder. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 JUDGMENT administratively terminating the case Signed by Clerk on 1/24/20. (JHF)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk directed to administratively terminate this action. If plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he shall notify the Court in writing no later than 30 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff's writing shall include either (1) a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required certification of the Plaintiff's inmate trust account and authorization form, or (2) the $400.00 filing fees; upon plaintiffs submission of either, Clerk shall re-open this case. Clerk directed to send to plaintiff a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 1/23/20. (JHF)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Copy of #3 Order, #4 Judgment and a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation mailed to pro se plaintiff. (JHF)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ryan James Reeder. (JHF)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian D. Dennis, William J. Hart, James B. Ritts, Michael Strohm, Steven Vine, filed by Ryan James Reeder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (JHF)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Prisoner Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (JHF)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeder v. Dennis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Strohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Vine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.D.A. James B. Ritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian D. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan James Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?