Thomas v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Harvel Thomas
Respondent: Thomas Brophy, Thomas E. Feeley, William P. Barr and Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 6:2020cv06362
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by William P. Barr, Thomas Brophy, Department of Homeland Security, Thomas E. Feeley re #4 Response to Habeas Petition, (Khalil, Adam)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William P. Barr, Thomas Brophy, Department of Homeland Security, Thomas E. Feeley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of DO Robert Morris, #2 Exhibit A to Morris Declaration, #3 Declaration of Assistant Officer in Charge Hobart, #4 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Petition)(Khalil, Adam)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Khalil on behalf of William P. Barr, Thomas Brophy, Department of Homeland Security, Thomas E. Feeley (Khalil, Adam)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that within 45 days of the date of this Order, Respondents shall file and serve an answer responding to the allegations in the Petition. Petitioner shall have 25 days after his receipt of the Respondents' answer or motion to dismiss to file a written response. he Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of the Petition, together with a copy of this Order, electronically via a Notice of Electronic Filing to the United States Attorney's Office, Western District of New York. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 6/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 petition)(mailed a copy of this order to Plaintiff)(TF)
June 4, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Prisoner Pro Se packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (TF)
June 3, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number ROC012244 (TF)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Harvel Thomas. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Brophy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas E. Feeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harvel Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?