United States of America v. $160,040 United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $160,040 United States Currency
Case Number: 6:2020cv06390
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 E-Filing Notification: DISREGARD E-FILING NOTATION - #1 COMPLAINT - warrant in rem should be an attachment to the complaint. Action required: either e-file using event continuation of exhibits or hand deliver to the Clerk' Office for issuance. USA filed a motion for a warrant in rem per Supplemental Rule G(3)(b)(ii). (TF) Modified on 6/16/2020.
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America.(Carducci, Grace)
June 12, 2020 E-Filing Notification: re #1 COMPLAINT Action Required: Attorney directed to file an Arrest Warrant in Rem to be issued. (CGJ)
June 12, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
June 12, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $160,040 United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carducci, Grace)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $160,040 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $160,040 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Grace M. Carducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?