Document Dynamics, LLC v. Xerox Corporation
Plaintiff: Document Dynamics, LLC
Defendant: Xerox Corporation
Case Number: 6:2020cv06519
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 84 Report on the Filing or Determination of Patent or Trademark Case sent to USPTO. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (CGJ)
July 21, 2020 Filing 83 Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:18-cv-00411.
July 21, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
July 21, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
July 7, 2020 Filing 82 AO 120 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Ruling) (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 81 RULING granting #72 Motion to Transfer to Another District. The clerk shall transfer this action to the District Court for Western District of New York. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 7/2/2020. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
July 2, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 80 Joint MOTION For Modification of the Case Schedule by Document Dynamics, LLC.Responses due by 6/16/2020 (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to #72 MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (A1-A9))(Caldwell, Michael) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 78 Memorandum in Opposition re #72 MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by Document Dynamics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF JAMES CAFFARY, #2 DECLARATION OF ROBERT KIDDIE, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Docket Entry Correction re #77 Notice. Document #77 Entered in Error - Per the local rules, discovery is not to be filed. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 77 ENTERED IN ERROR - NOTICE by Document Dynamics, LLC for First Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Kiddie, Robert) Modified on 3/2/2020 to mark as entered in error (Bozek, M.). [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Reset Deadline as to #72 MOTION to Transfer to Another District . Response/Reply due by 3/10/2020. See 75 Order. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: In light of the outstanding motion to transfer, the court denies the #74 motion for a modification of the case schedule without prejudice to refiling if the case does not transfer. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 2/25/2020. (Sondergeld, C.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting the #73 motion for extension of time to file a response/reply to the #72 motion to transfer to and including March 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 2/25/2020. (Sondergeld, C.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 74 Joint MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF CASE SCHEDULE by Document Dynamics, LLC.Responses due by 3/16/2020 (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #72 MOTION to Transfer to Another District until March 10, 2020 by Document Dynamics, LLC. (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION to Transfer to Another District by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A1-A11, #3 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Michael) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting the joint #70 motion for protective order; approving the (70-1) proposed stipulated protective order and the proposed (70-2) stipulated E-discovery orders. The court further notes that the parties shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(1) and Loc. R. Civ. P. 37(a) by conferring "in person or by telephone, with opposing counsel and discuss[ing] the discovery issues between them in detail in a good faith effort to eliminate or reduce the area of controversy, and to arrive at a mutually satisfactory resolution," prior to filing any motions related to discovery disputes with the court. Loc. R. Civ. P. 37(a). Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 1/13/2020. (Covello, Alfred) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 70 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order and Stipulated E-Discovery Order) by Xerox Corporation.Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Michael) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #58 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas Hoehner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5481783) by Xerox Corporation. (Caldwell, Michael) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #59 MOTION for Attorney(s) Denis J. Sullivan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5481836) by Xerox Corporation. (Caldwell, Michael) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting Woo Sin Sean Park's #65 motion to withdraw as attorney for the defendant. Attorney Woo Sin Sean Park terminated. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/18/2019. (Sondergeld, C.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting attorney Elizabeth Ann Alquist's #64 motion to withdraw as attorney for the defendant. Attorney Elizabeth Ann Alquist terminated. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/18/2019. (Sondergeld, C.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Woo Sin Sean Park to Withdraw as Attorney by Xerox Corporation. (Park, Woo) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION for Elizabeth A. Alquist to Withdraw as Attorney by Xerox Corporation. (Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Denis James Sullivan on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Sullivan, Denis) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Hoehner on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Hoehner, Thomas) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #59 motion for Denis J. Sullivan to appear as a visiting attorney. Attorney Sullivan shall file a certificate of good standing on or before 12/15/2019. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/16/19. (Sondergeld, C.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #58 motion for admission of attorney Thomas Hoehner as a visiting attorney. Attorney Thomas Hoehner shall provide a certificate of good standing on or before 12/15/2019. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/16/19. (Sondergeld, C.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Attorney(s) Denis J. Sullivan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5481836) by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Caldwell, Michael) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas Hoehner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5481783) by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Caldwell, Michael) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Caldwell on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Caldwell, Michael) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Reset Deadlines per 56 Order: Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2020. Joint Trial Memorandum due by 8/3/2020. Trial Ready Date 9/2/2020. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #54 motion for a status conference and amendment of the scheduling order. The scheduling order is hereby amended as follows: completion of document discovery on or before March 2, 2020; close of discovery on or before June 1, 2020; dispositive motions due on or before July 1, 2020; joint trial memorandum due on or before August 3, 2020. The case shall be ready for trial on or before September 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/3/2019. (Covello, Alfred) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying the defendant's #38 motion for summary judgment, without prejudice to refiling at the conclusion of discovery. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/3/2019. (Covello, Alfred) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for status Conference for Modification of The Case Schedule by Document Dynamics, LLC. (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying #34 motion to compel. A motion to compel disclosure or discovery "must include a certification that the movant has in good faith conferred or attempted to confer with the person or party failing to make disclosure or discovery in an effort to obtain it without court action." Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(a)(1). In addition, local Rule 37(a) provides that "[n]o motion pursuant to Rules 26 through 37, Fed.R.Civ.P. shall be filed unless counsel making the motion has conferred, in person or by telephone, with opposing counsel and discussed the discovery issues between them in detail in a good faith effort to eliminate or reduce the area of controversy, and to arrive at a mutually satisfactory resolution." D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 37(a). Local Rule 37(a) makes it clear that the onus is on the parties to make every effort to resolve disputes related to discovery, prior to involving the court. The plaintiff attached an affidavit of its counsel, describing the efforts made to meet and confer with the defendant's counsel. On February 13, 2019, the plaintiff filed the within motion to compel, without having met with opposing counsel regarding the underlying discovery disputes. The court concludes that the efforts articulated in the affidavit fall short of the requirements of the aforementioned federal and local rules. While the plaintiff's counsel argues in its response that he attempted in good faith to meet and confer before the deadline for discovery lapsed, the courts scheduling order "may be modified on a showing of good cause and with the judges consent." Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(4). The court has since modified the discovery deadline in this case. Accordingly, the parties shall confer, as provided in Local Rule 37(a), "in a good faith effort to eliminate or reduce the area of controversy, and to arrive at a mutually satisfactory resolution" to their discovery disputes, prior to filing any further motions. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 9/13/2019. (Covello, Alfred) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 7/29/2019, at 10:00 a.m., in Chambers Room 125 - Annex, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT, before attorney Charles Corcoran. The first three hours shall be without cost to the parties. If the parties wish to continue thereafter, they shall jointly compensate attorney Corcoran a total of $190.00 per hour. The parties shall send their ex-parte statements to attorney Corcoran on or before July 22, 2019, and may contact chambers for his email address. (Codeanne, K.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Xerox Corporation. (Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Reset Deadline as to #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Response/Reply due by 6/14/2019. See 50 Order. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 motion for extension of time to file response/reply to and including 6/14/19. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/14/19. (Hall, Gregory) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 49 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment until June 14, 2019 by Xerox Corporation. (Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE re #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Document Dynamics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn Weadock, #2 Declaration of Robert Kiddie, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Statement of Material Facts 56(a)2)(Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Reset Response Deadline as to #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 5/3/2019. See 47 Order. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 motion for extension of time to file response/reply to and including 5/3/19. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 4/18/19. (Hall, Gregory) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment until May 3, 2019 by Document Dynamics, LLC. (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Reset Response Deadline as to #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 4/19/2019. See 43 Order. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Reset Deadlines per 45 Order: Discovery due by 10/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2019. Joint Trial Brief due by 12/2/2019. Trial Ready Date 1/1/2020. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #31 motion to modify the schedule. Discovery due on or before 10/1/19; dispositive motions due on or before 11/1/19; joint trial brief due on or before 12/2/19. The case shall be ready for trial on or before 1/1/20. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 4/4/19. (Hall, Gregory) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying #42 motion for telephonic status conference. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 4/4/19. (Hall, Gregory) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 motion for extension of time to file response/reply to and including 4/19/19. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 4/4/19. (Hall, Gregory) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Telephonic Status Conference by Document Dynamics, LLC.Responses due by 4/22/2019 (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION for Summary Judgment until April 19, 2019 by Document Dynamics, LLC. (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Xerox Corporation.(Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to #33 MOTION to Compel discovery response filed by Document Dynamics, LLC. (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Xerox Corporation.Responses due by 4/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Alquist, #4 Exhibit A to Alquist Decl., #5 Exhibit B to Alquist Decl., #6 Exhibit C to Alquist Decl., #7 Exhibit D to Alquist Decl., #8 Exhibit E to Alquist Decl., #9 Exhibit F to Alquist Decl., #10 Exhibit G to Alquist Decl., #11 Exhibit H to Alquist Decl., #12 Exhibit I to Alquist Decl., #13 Exhibit J to Alquist Decl.)(Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 37 Ruling denying #20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 2/25/2019. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE re #33 MOTION to Compel discovery response, #34 MOTION (motion cover for Docket 33) re #33 MOTION to Compel discovery response filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to #31 MOTION for Modified Schedule filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION (motion cover for Docket 33) re #33 MOTION to Compel discovery response by Document Dynamics, LLC.Responses due by 3/6/2019 (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 33 Memorandum in Support re: MOTION to Compel discovery response by Document Dynamics, LLC.Responses due by 3/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Affidavit of Robert Kiddie, #11 Exhibit A)(Kiddie, Robert) Modified on 4/8/2019 to indicate document is a memorandum in support (Bozek, M.). [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE re #31 MOTION for Modified Schedule filed by Document Dynamics, LLC. (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Modified Schedule by Xerox Corporation.Responses due by 2/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to #20 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Xerox Corporation. (Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due on or before 9/14/2018; Discovery due on or before 2/15/2019; Dispositive Motions due on or before 3/15/2019; Trial Brief due on or before 4/15/2019; Trial Ready Date 5/15/2019. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 24, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER - Proposed Scheduling Order by Document Dynamics, LLC. (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 26 Memorandum in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Document Dynamics, LLC. (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Woo Sin Sean Park on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Park, Woo) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
July 11, 2018 Reset Response Deadline as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Response due by 7/17/2018 per 24 Order. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 motion for extension of time to file response/reply. The time for the plaintiff to respond to the defendant's motion to dismiss is hereby extended to and including July 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on July 11, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint until July 17, 2018 by Document Dynamics, LLC. (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 22 26(f) NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 14 days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty four days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties must file on or before : 7/23/2018, (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a form 26(f) report; or (2) a form 26(f) report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Clerk on 7/9/2018.(Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Xerox Corporation. (Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Xerox Corporation.Responses due by 7/10/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
May 23, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Xerox Corporation to 6/19/2018 per 19 Order. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 motion for extension of time. The time for the defendant to respond to the plaintiff's complaint is hereby extended to and including June 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on May 23, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 19, 2018 to Answer or Otherwise Respond #1 Complaint by Xerox Corporation. (Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
May 1, 2018 Answer deadline updated for Xerox Corporation to 5/29/2018 per 17 Order. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 motion for extension of time. The time for the defendant to respond to the plaintiff's complaint is hereby extended to and including May 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on May 1, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 29, 2018 to Answer or Otherwise Respond #1 Complaint by Xerox Corporation. (Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert Kiddie to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4766224) by Document Dynamics, LLC. (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Kiddie, Jr on behalf of Document Dynamics, LLC (Kiddie, Robert) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Attorney Robert Kiddie to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/27/2018. Signed by Clerk on 3/28/2018. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert Kiddie to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4766224) by Document Dynamics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert Kiddie)(Taiman, Edward) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 21, 2018 Answer deadline updated per 11 Order for Xerox Corporation to 5/5/2018. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion for extension of time. The time for the defendant to respond to the plaintiff's complaint is hereby extended to and including May 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on March 21, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 5, 2018 to Answer or Otherwise Respond #1 Complaint by Xerox Corporation. (Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Alquist on behalf of Xerox Corporation (Alquist, Elizabeth) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Document Dynamics, LLC. Xerox Corporation served on 3/15/2018, answer due 4/5/2018. (Taiman, Edward) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Document Dynamics, LLC. (Taiman, Edward) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 6 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Xerox Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Edward C. Taiman, Jr.* *Sabia Taiman, LLC* *450 Church Street* *Hartford, CT 06103-1107*. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-representing parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Document Dynamics, LLC, and Request to Issue Summons. Signed by Clerk on 3/9/2018.(Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/8/2018.(Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 6/8/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 5/7/2018. Discovery due by 9/7/2018. Signed by Clerk on 3/8/2018.(Bozek, M.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xerox Corporation, filed by Document Dynamics, LLC. [Filing Fee $400.00; receipt # ACTDC-4747259] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, J.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 8, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Xerox Corporation. (Taiman, Edward) Modified on 3/8/2018 (Walker, J.). [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]
March 8, 2018 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from ctd on 7/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Document Dynamics, LLC v. Xerox Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Document Dynamics, LLC
Represented By: Robert Kiddie, Jr
Represented By: Edward C. Taiman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xerox Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Hoehner
Represented By: Michael G. Caldwell
Represented By: Denis James Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?