United States of America v. One 1980 Chevrolet Corvette bearing VIN: 1Z878AS427623 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: ONE 2006 BENTLEY BEARING VIN: SCBBR53W46C038675, ONE 2012 HONDA RIDGELINE BEARING VIN: 5FPYK1F54CB458191 and ONE 1980 CHEVROLET CORVETTE BEARING VIN: 1Z878AS427623
Claimant: Evelyn Banchs
Case Number: 6:2020cv06553
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Evelyn Banchs (Gunther, Neil)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION filed by United States of America Declaration of Publication. (Carducci, Grace)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ARREST WARRANT IN REM Returned executed upon One 1980 Chevrolet Corvette, One 2006 Bentley, and One 2012 Honda Ridgeline (TF)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Carducci, Grace)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. (JD)
July 30, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
July 30, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Forfeiture against ONE 1980 CHEVROLET CORVETTE BEARING VIN: 1Z878AS427623, ONE 2006 BENTLEY BEARING VIN: SCBBR53W46C038675, ONE 2012 HONDA RIDGELINE BEARING VIN: 5FPYK1F54CB458191, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Arrest Warrants In Rem)(Carducci, Grace)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 1980 Chevrolet Corvette bearing VIN: 1Z878AS427623 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE 2006 BENTLEY BEARING VIN: SCBBR53W46C038675
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE 2012 HONDA RIDGELINE BEARING VIN: 5FPYK1F54CB458191
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE 1980 CHEVROLET CORVETTE BEARING VIN: 1Z878AS427623
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Grace M. Carducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Evelyn Banchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?