Quinones v. Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Monica Quinones
Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. and Stephen Einstein and Associates, P.C.
Case Number: 6:2020cv06559
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marian W Payson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER (Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2020 10:20 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Counsel will be provided dial-in instructions by email prior to the conference.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 9/9/2020. (KAH)
September 9, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LVNV Funding LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sherman Financial Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Alegis Group, LLC for LVNV Funding LLC.. (Sanders, Arthur)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by LVNV Funding LLC.(Sanders, Arthur)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Sherman Financial Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Alegis Group, LLC for Resurgent Capital Services, L.P... (Sanders, Arthur)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P..(Sanders, Arthur)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/24/2020. (BK)
August 24, 2020 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JLV)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stephen Einstein and Associates, P.C.. (Sanders, Arthur)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Stephen Einstein and Associates, P.C..(Sanders, Arthur)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Sanders on behalf of Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. (Sanders, Arthur)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Sanders on behalf of LVNV Funding LLC (Sanders, Arthur)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monica Quinones. Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Hardy, Tiffany)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monica Quinones. LVNV Funding LLC served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Hardy, Tiffany)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Sanders on behalf of Stephen Einstein and Associates, P.C. (Sanders, Arthur)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monica Quinones. Stephen Einstein and Associates, P.C. served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Hardy, Tiffany)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LVNV Funding LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., Stephen Einstein and Associates, P.C. (JD)
August 3, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
August 3, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
August 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany N. Hardy on behalf of Monica Quinones (Hardy, Tiffany)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3922615, filed by Monica Quinones. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons to Defendant LVNV, #6 Proposed Summons to Defendant Resurgent, #7 Proposed Summons to Defendant Einstein & Associates)(Hardy, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinones v. Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Quinones
Represented By: Tiffany N. Hardy
Represented By: David M. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding LLC
Represented By: Arthur Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Represented By: Arthur Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Einstein and Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Arthur Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?