First Baptist Church of Fairport New York v. Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Plaintiff: First Baptist Church of Fairport New York
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Case Number: 6:2020cv06611
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Referring Judge: Mark W Pedersen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT SCHEDULING/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Mandatory Disclosures due by 10/6/2020. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 9/22/2020. (JB)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen: Appearances: Scott Evan Agulnick, Esq. for plaintiff; Joshua M. C. O'Neill, Esq. for defendant. Parties meet and confer to discuss dates. Mandatory Disclosures due 10/6/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 11:00 AM before Hon Mark W. Pedersen. This conference will take place both in person or by telephone. Parties appearing by phone will call, from a landline telephone, 877-402-9753, and enter access code 7137484 at the scheduled date and time. (Court Reporter AT&T Conference.) (JB)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by First Baptist Church of Fairport New York. (Agulnick, Scott)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Evan Agulnick on behalf of First Baptist Church of Fairport New York (Agulnick, Scott)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. re #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Answer to Complaint (Fellows, Jonathan)
August 31, 2020 E-Filing Notification: No proof of service. Action required: File proof of service for #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (JHF)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Mark W. Pedersen. A joint proposed discovery plan is due to be filed at least 4 business days prior to the conference. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 8/31/2020. (JB)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Fellows, Jonathan)
August 28, 2020 E-Filing Notification: The Corporate Disclosure was incorrectly filed as an attachment to #4 Answer. Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statements are always filed as a separate document. Attorney directed to re-file the Corporate Disclosure Statement separately and under the correct event. The filing event is found in CM/ECF under: Civil Events>Other Filings>Other Documents>Corporate Disclosure Statement. Additionally, the Plaintiff's attorney is not yet electronically registered with the WDNY and does not receive electronic notice. Until he is registered, Defendant's attorney is required to mail paper copies of their filings to Plaintiff's attorney and file the accompanying Certificate of Service. (JHF)
August 28, 2020 Remark: A copy of ECF No. 5 was mailed to Scott Agulnick. (JEH)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Hon. Mark W. Pedersen, United States Magistrate Judge, for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. The parties are encouraged to consider consenting to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Consent forms are available from the Magistrate Judge's chambers or the Clerk of Court's office. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/28/2020. (JEH)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) (Fellows, Jonathan)
August 20, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TF)
August 20, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
August 20, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
August 20, 2020 E-Filing Notification: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - If you are not admitted in the WDNY you must either file a motion to appear Pro hac vice or seek admission in this District and register to file and receive service of documents electronically through the district's Case Management/Electronic Case Filing system (CM/ECF). The registration form and attorney admission instructions and forms can be located on the Court's Public Web site at www.nywd.uscourts.gov (TF)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Notice of Removal, Index. (O'Neill, Joshua)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan B. Fellows on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Fellows, Jonathan)
August 18, 2020 E-Filing Notification: RE #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. Removal missing index. Action required: file index under event CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS. LR 81(3)(A). (TF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. from Supreme Court of the State of New York County of Monroe, case number E2020003397. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3941010), filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Mailing)(O'Neill, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Baptist Church of Fairport New York v. Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Joshua M. C. O'Neill
Represented By: Edward P. Hourihan, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan B. Fellows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Baptist Church of Fairport New York
Represented By: Scott Evan Agulnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?