OmniProphis Corp. v. Vanteon Corp.
Plaintiff: OmniProphis Corp. and OmniProphis Corp. doing business as Screened Images, Inc.
Defendant: Vanteon Corp.
Case Number: 6:2020cv06612
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OmniProphis Corp.. OmniProphis Corp. waiver sent on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Paulino, James)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OmniProphis Corp.. (Paulino, James)
September 16, 2020 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael P. Sams. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 9/15/2020. (KAC)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lindsay M. Burke. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 9/15/2020. (KAC)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
September 14, 2020 Verified admission to the Massachusetts State Bar for Attorney's Lindsay M. Burke and Michael P. Sams. (MD)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-3971083.) by OmniProphis Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Paulino, James)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-3971079.) by OmniProphis Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Paulino, James)
August 18, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG)
August 18, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
August 18, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. (SG)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3940948, filed by OmniProphis Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Paulino, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OmniProphis Corp. v. Vanteon Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OmniProphis Corp.
Represented By: James Michael Paulino, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OmniProphis Corp. doing business as Screened Images, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Sams
Represented By: Nicholas J. Pontzer
Represented By: Lindsay M. Burke
Represented By: James Michael Paulino, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanteon Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?