Charter Communications, Inc. v. Gonzalez
Petitioner: Charter Communications, Inc.
Respondent: Edward Gonzalez
Case Number: 6:2020cv06634
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/20/20. (JHF)
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charter Communications, Inc. (Jaffe, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT Regarding Resolution of Case by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Jaffe, Daniel)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting the parties' request for a 30 day stay of this matter, including a stay on the Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Expedited Hearing because the parties have reached a tentative agreement to proceed to arbitration. The parties are directed to notify the Court at such time as an agreement is finalized, or provide a status report by October 14, 2020 if an agreement is not reached by that date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 09/14/2020. (SFR)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Randall S. Thompson. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/8/20. (JHF)
September 8, 2020 Verified admission to the Missouri State Bar for Attorney Randall S. Thompson. (MD)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Charter Communications, Inc.. Notice of Motion and Motion to Admit Randall S. Thompson Pro Hac Vice - Added to Document No. 10 with attachments filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Notarized Declaration/Affidavit of Daniel P. Jaffe Supporting Motion to Admit Randall S. Thompson Pro Hac Vice)(Jaffe, Daniel)
August 31, 2020 E-Filing Notification: #10 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Randall S. Thompson :The Motion to Appear has not been filed, also the Sponsoring Affidavit has not been notarized, Attorney directed to e-file notarized Sponsoring Affidavit as well as the Motion to Appear using the Continuation of Exhibits event, found under Responses and Replies. (MD)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charter Communications, Inc.. Edward Gonzalez served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Jaffe, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Text Order Declaration of Service of Text Order (Doc. No. 9) served on Respondent Edward Gonzalez on August 28, 2020, filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Jaffe, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Randall S. Thompson ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-3955508.) by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Oath of Office - Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 ECF Registration for Pro Hac Vice Applicant R. Thompson, #3 Sponsor Declaration of Daniel P. Jaffe)(Jaffe, Daniel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Petitioner filed its Petition to Compel Arbitration on August 25, 2020. ECF No. #1 . On August 26, 2020, Petitioner filed a Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. #5 , a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #6 , and a Motion to Expedite a Hearing on the Injunctive Relief Motions, ECF no. #7 . Having found good cause exists to expedite, Petitioner's Motion to Expedite, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED. Petitioner shall serve Respondent with the Petition and file an affidavit of service to that effect no later than September 1, 2020. Respondent shall respond to the Petition on or before September 8, 2020. Petitioner may reply on or before September 11, 2020. The Court will review the submissions and determine if oral argument is necessary and, if so, the Court will notify the parties of the date and time. Finally, Petitioner is directed to service a copy of this Text Order on Respondent and file an affidavit of service to that effect by September 1, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/27/2020. (BJJ)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Charter Communications, Inc.. Notice of Witnesses and Exhibits to be Presented at Preliminary Injunction hearing filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Jaffe, Daniel)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motions for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for preliminary Injunction by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Hearing on Motions for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Expedited Hearing on Motions for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Jaffe, Daniel)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to enjoin Respondent from breaching Arbitration Agreement and to compel arbitration by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction)(Jaffe, Daniel)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Enjoin Respondent from Breaching Arbitration Agreement and Compel Arbitration by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(Jaffe, Daniel)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Edward Gonzalez. (JD)
August 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
August 26, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
August 26, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charter Communications, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Liberty Broadband Corporation for Charter Communications, Inc... (Jaffe, Daniel)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Charter Communications, Inc.. Exhibits D through I to Petition to Compel Arbitration plus Civil Cover Sheet and Summons filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Declaration-Affidavit of John Fries, #2 Exhibit F - Letter to Gonzalez from Charter 5-3-2019, #3 Exhibit G - Response of Charter to Gonzalez Complaint, #4 Exhibit H - Letter from Charter's Attorney to Gonzalez's Attorney 4-21-2020, #5 Exhibit I - Notice of 9-30-2020 Preliminary Conference ber NY Division of Human Rights, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons to Edward Gonzalez)(Jaffe, Daniel)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Compel Arbitration against Edward Gonzalez $ 400 receipt number 0209-3950428, filed by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arbitration agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Determination After Investigation, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint of Gonzalez)(Jaffe, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charter Communications, Inc. v. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P. Jaffe
Represented By: Randall S. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edward Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?