Leonard's Express, Inc. v. Schneider National Carriers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Leonard's Express, Inc.
Defendant: Schneider National Carriers, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv06663
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Referring Judge: Marian W Payson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Robert D. Moseley, Jr. to appear Pro Hac Vice. The admission fee has been paid to the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 10/29/20. (CAM)
October 29, 2020 Verified admission to the South Carolina State Bar for Attorney Robert D. Moseley, Jr. (MD)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4028638.) by Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Schechter, Joel)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 12:00 PM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Counsel will be provided dial-in instructions by email prior to the conference.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 10/22/2020. (KAH)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter D. Cantone on behalf of Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Cantone, Peter)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Hon. Marian W. Payson, United States Magistrate Judge, for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. The parties are encouraged to consider consenting to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Consent forms are available from the Magistrate Judge's chambers or the Clerk of Court's office. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/20/2020. (SFR)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National, Inc. for Schneider National Carriers, Inc... (Schechter, Joel)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses & Demand for Jury Trial by Schneider National Carriers, Inc..(Schechter, Joel)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leonard's Express, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent KJ3 Holdings, Inc. for Leonard's Express, Inc... (Whitford, Mark)
September 18, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Please note for future reference that the proper event is summons returned executed. No action required RE #5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (TF)
September 17, 2020 RE #5 - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leonard's Express, Inc.. Schneider National Carriers, Inc. served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (TF)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Schneider National Carriers, Inc. through NYS Dept. of State on 9/9/20, filed by Leonard's Express, Inc.. (Whitford, Mark)
September 16, 2020 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (TF)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons Filed. (Whitford, Mark)
September 8, 2020 Remark: Original summons not submitted. (JD)
September 8, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
September 8, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
September 8, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint . (Whitford, Mark)
September 4, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Attorney is directed to file a civil cover sheet, pursuant to Local Rule 3. No judge assignment will be made until filing is entered on the docket. Please utilize the Continuation of Exhibits event, located within the Responses and Replies category. (JD)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Schneider National Carriers, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3961987, filed by Leonard's Express, Inc..(Whitford, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard's Express, Inc. v. Schneider National Carriers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Peter D. Cantone
Represented By: Joel B. Schechter
Represented By: Robert D. Moseley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard's Express, Inc.
Represented By: Mark T. Whitford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?