Yang et al v. Ardizzone et al
Plaintiff: Siyu Yang, Ying Zhu and Lu Yang
Defendant: Mercedes Ramirez Fernandez, Jamal J. Rossi, Sarah C. Mangelsdorf and Matthew Ardizzone
Case Number: 6:2020cv06691
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to Matthew Ardizzone, Mercedes Ramirez Fernandez, Sarah C. Mangelsdorf, Jamal J. Rossi. Summonses mailed to plaintiffs. (KM)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Matthew Ardizzone, Mercedes Ramirez Fernandez, Sarah C. Mangelsdorf, Jamal J. Rossi, filed by Siyu Yang, Lu Yang, Ying Zhu.(KM)
October 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to Matthew Ardizzone, Mercedes Ramirez Fernandez, Sarah C. Mangelsdorf, Jamal J. Rossi. Summonses mailed to plaintiff. (TF)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Lu Yang and Siyu Yang, dated 10/18/2020, to Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (KM)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION against Matthew Ardizzone, Mercedes Ramirez Fernandez, Sarah C. Mangelsdorf, Jamal J. Rossi, filed by Siyu Yang, Lu Yang. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(TF)
September 25, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number BUF069675 (TF)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw as a party by Ying Zhu.(TF)
September 11, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
September 11, 2020 Remark: Plaintiff's have been mailed a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, Pro Se Assistance Program Information and ADR Notification. (CGJ)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-04139.
September 10, 2020 Case transferred to District of Western District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Ramesar, Thameera) [Transferred from nyed on 9/11/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), transfer of this action is appropriate. See attached Order for details. The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. No summons shall issue from this Court. The Court notes that Plaintiffs have not paid the filing fee or requested a waiver. The Court waives Rule 83.1 of the Local Rules of the Eastern District of New York, which requires a seven-day delay before effectuating the transfer. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to mail a copy of the attached Order to the pro se litigants. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 9/8/2020. (Williams, Erica) [Transferred from nyed on 9/11/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 9/11/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Siyu Yang, Lu Yang, Ying Zhu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 9/11/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang et al v. Ardizzone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Ramirez Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamal J. Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah C. Mangelsdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ardizzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siyu Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ying Zhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lu Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?