Bethany v. Noeth
Petitioner: Rayshawn Bethany
Respondent: Joseph H. Noeth
Case Number: 6:2020cv06761
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER denying as moot Petitioner's #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner has already been granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. See ECF No. 5. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/9/2020. A copy of this Text Order was mailed to the pro se Petitioner. (JEH)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rayshawn Bethany.(TF)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Respondent shall file and serve an answer responding to the allegations in the Petition within 90 days of the date of this Order. Petitioner shall have 30 days after his receipt of Respondents answer or other pleading to file a written reply. The Clerk of Court shall electronically serve a copy of the Petition, together with a copy of this Order, via a Notice of Electronic Filing to Donna Milling. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Petition) Mailed a copy of this order to petitioner. (TF)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Rayshawn Bethany, dated 9/28/2020, to Clerk (TF)
September 29, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Prisoner Pro Se packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (TF)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rayshawn Bethany.(TF)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Rayshawn Bethany.(TF)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Rayshawn Bethany.(TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bethany v. Noeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rayshawn Bethany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph H. Noeth
Represented By: Donna Milling (e-service)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?