Crown Castle Fiber LLC v. City of Rochester, New York et al
Plaintiff: Crown Castle Fiber LLC
Defendant: City of Rochester, New York, Commissioner Norman Jones, Rochester City Council, Mayor Lovely A. Warren, Lovely A. Warren and Norman Jones
Case Number: 6:2020cv06866
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marian W Payson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Telephone Status Conference set for 4/6/2021 11:40 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to counsel prior to the conference. Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 1/4/2021. First Mediation Session due by 2/25/2021. Mediation To End by 4/26/2021. Mandatory Disclosures due by 12/11/2020. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 1/11/2021. Fact Discovery to be completed by 4/16/2021. Expert Witness ID due by 5/21/2021. Rebuttal Expert Witness ID due by 6/18/2021. Reply Reports due by 7/2/2021. Expert Discovery to be completed by 8/6/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/10/2021. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 12/3/2020. (KAH)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DISCOVERY PLAN by Crown Castle Fiber LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery Plan, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed ESI Order, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Rule 502 Order)(Cassidy-Young, Carlotta)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 11:20 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Counsel will be provided dial-in instructions by email prior to the conference.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 11/17/2020. (KAH)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marian W. Payson for all pre-trial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/16/20. (JHF)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG)
November 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Rochester, New York, Norman Jones, Rochester City Council, Lovely A. Warren.(Beath, Patrick)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice by Joshua S. Turner and #8 motion to appear pro hac vice by Sara M. Baxenberg. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/28/2020. (CAL) -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Verified admission to the District of Columbia State Bar for Attorney's Sara M. Baxenberg and Joshua S. Turner. (MD)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Crown Castle Fiber LLC. to #8 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Sara M. Baxenberg ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4025275.) Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice filed by Crown Castle Fiber LLC. (Gaudioso, Robert)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Crown Castle Fiber LLC. to #7 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Joshua S. Turner ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4025154.) Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice filed by Crown Castle Fiber LLC. (Gaudioso, Robert)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: #7 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Joshua S. Turner ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4025154.), #8 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Sara M. Baxenberg ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4025275.) The actual Motion has not been filed. Please e-file the Motion using the Continuation of Exhibits event found under Responses and Replies. (MD)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Sara M. Baxenberg ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4025275.) by Crown Castle Fiber LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Affidavit)(Gaudioso, Robert)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Joshua S. Turner ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4025154.) by Crown Castle Fiber LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Affidavit)(Gaudioso, Robert)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crown Castle Fiber LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Gaudioso, Robert)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to City of Rochester, New York, Norman Jones, Rochester City Council, Lovely A. Warren. (JD)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Dominick Gaudioso on behalf of Crown Castle Fiber LLC (Gaudioso, Robert)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Crown Castle Fiber LLC. to #1 Complaint, EXHIBIT B filed by Crown Castle Fiber LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N)(Cassidy-Young, Carlotta)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Castle Fiber LLC identifying Corporate Parent Crown Castle Fiber Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Crown Castle Operating Company, Corporate Parent Crown Castle International Corp. for Crown Castle Fiber LLC.. (Cassidy-Young, Carlotta)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against City of Rochester, New York, Norman Jones, Rochester City Council, Lovely A. Warren $ 400 receipt number 0209-4017152, filed by Crown Castle Fiber LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Request)(Cassidy-Young, Carlotta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crown Castle Fiber LLC v. City of Rochester, New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rochester, New York
Represented By: Patrick Beath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Norman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester City Council
Represented By: Patrick Beath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Lovely A. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovely A. Warren
Represented By: Patrick Beath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Jones
Represented By: Patrick Beath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crown Castle Fiber LLC
Represented By: Carlotta Cassidy-Young
Represented By: Robert Dominick Gaudioso
Represented By: Joshua S. Turner
Represented By: Sara M. Baxenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?