Lighthouse Baptist Church, Inc. et al v. Chemung County et al
Plaintiff: Matthew James Mayer, Lighthouse Baptist Church, Inc., Richard Hack, Robert Paul Glisson, Matt Mayer and Paul Glisson
Defendant: Pete Buzzetti, Chemung County, Chemung County Health Department, Mari Delaney and Christopher Moss
Case Number: 6:2020cv07000
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matt Mayer, Richard Hack, Paul Glisson, Lighthouse Baptist Church, Inc.. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service - Chemung County Health Dept., #2 Proof of Service - Christopher Moss, #3 Proof of Service - Pete Buzzetti, #4 Proof of Service - Mari Delaney)(Rupp, R.)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION re #2 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Pursuant to the Stipulated Injunction executed by the parties, Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is granted. Accordingly, the oral argument scheduled for December 10, 2020, is cancelled. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 12/04/2020. (CAL).
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Appearance served on Rupp and Davenport on 12/4/2020, filed by Pete Buzzetti, Chemung County, Chemung County Health Department, Mari Delaney, Christopher Moss. (Hussain, Mohammad)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mohammad Hyder Hussain on behalf of All Defendants (Hussain, Mohammad)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order of Elizabeth A. Wolford, U.S.D.J served on M. Hyder Hussain, Esq. on November 24, 2020, filed by Paul Glisson, Richard Hack, Lighthouse Baptist Church, Inc., Matt Mayer. (Rupp, R.)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/24/2020. (CAL)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A. Davenport on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davenport, Chad)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pete Buzzetti, Chemung County, Chemung County Health Department, Mari Delaney, Christopher Moss. (JD)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Robert Paul Glisson, Richard Hack, Lighthouse Baptist Church, Inc., Matthew James Mayer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Anthony Rupp III, Esq. with Exs. A&B, #2 Declaration of Richard Hack with Exs. A&B, #3 Declaration of Matthew J. Mayer, #4 Declaration of Robert Paul Glisson, #5 Memorandum in Support)(Rupp, R.)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint and Jury Demand against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-4055437, filed by Matthew James Mayer, Richard Hack, Robert Paul Glisson, Lighthouse Baptist Church, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Chemung County, #2 Summons - Chemung County Health Department, #3 Summons - Christopher Moss, #4 Summons - Pete Buzzetti, #5 Summons - Mari Delaney, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rupp, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lighthouse Baptist Church, Inc. et al v. Chemung County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew James Mayer
Represented By: R. Anthony Rupp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lighthouse Baptist Church, Inc.
Represented By: R. Anthony Rupp, III
Represented By: Chad A. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hack
Represented By: R. Anthony Rupp, III
Represented By: Chad A. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Paul Glisson
Represented By: R. Anthony Rupp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Mayer
Represented By: R. Anthony Rupp, III
Represented By: Chad A. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Glisson
Represented By: R. Anthony Rupp, III
Represented By: Chad A. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Buzzetti
Represented By: Mohammad Hyder Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemung County
Represented By: Mohammad Hyder Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemung County Health Department
Represented By: Mohammad Hyder Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mari Delaney
Represented By: Mohammad Hyder Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Moss
Represented By: Mohammad Hyder Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?