Conser v. Reidman-Wegman Canandaigua, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cathy Conser and Cathey Conser
Defendant: Reidman-Wegman Canandaigua, LLC, BME Associates, UFP New York LLC and James Fahey Designs
Case Number: 6:2021cv06065
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Referring Judge: Marian W Payson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Filing 36 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) The Telephone Status Conference set for 7/19/2022 is adjourned until 10/25/2022 at 11:40 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to counsel prior to the conference. First Mediation Session due by 6/14/2022. Mediation To End by 8/16/2022. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 7/5/2022. Fact Discovery to be completed by 11/15/2022. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 12/1/2022. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 1/3/2023. Expert Discovery to be completed by 2/15/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2023. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 3/14/2022. (KAH)
January 12, 2022 Filing 35 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) The Telephone Status Conference set for 5/24/2022 is adjourned until 7/19/2022 at 11:20 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to counsel prior to the conference. First Mediation Session due by 3/14/2022. Mediation To End by 5/16/2022. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 4/4/2022. Fact Discovery to be completed by 8/15/2022. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 8/31/2022. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 10/3/2022. Expert Discovery to be completed by 11/15/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/3/2023. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 1/12/2022. (KAH)
December 1, 2021 Filing 34 Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Cathey Conser(Lambrix, Laurie)
November 15, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Bambury on behalf of Cathey Conser (Bambury, Kevin)
October 20, 2021 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 10/20/2021. Appearances: Laurie M. Lambrix, Esq., John C. Nutter, Esq., Michael Damia, Esq., Brian F. Sutter, Esq. (CAM)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Telephone Status Conference set for 5/24/2022 11:40 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to counsel prior to the conference. Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 12/1/2021. First Mediation Session due by 1/12/2022. Mediation To End by 3/14/2022. Mandatory Disclosures due by 12/15/2021. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 2/1/2022. Fact Discovery to be completed by 6/15/2022. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 7/1/2022. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 8/1/2022. Expert Discovery to be completed by 9/15/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2022. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 10/20/2021. (KAH)
October 18, 2021 Filing 30 DISCOVERY PLAN by Cathey Conser.(Lambrix, Laurie)
September 9, 2021 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
September 8, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by James Fahey Designs.(Sutter, Brian)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to plaintiff's Amended Complaint as to defendant James Fahey Designs (Answer due date updated as to James Fahey Designs answer due 9/7/2021.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 8/26/2021. (KAH)
August 25, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #20 Amended Complaint Extending Time To Answer by James Fahey Designs. (Sutter, Brian)
August 25, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian F. Sutter on behalf of James Fahey Designs (Sutter, Brian)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER (Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2021 at 10:20 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Counsel will be provide dial-in instructions by email prior to the conference.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 8/24/2021. (KAH)
June 23, 2021 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to James Fahey Designs. (JHF)
June 22, 2021 Filing 23 Original Summons Filed. (Lambrix, Laurie)
June 2, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by Reidman-Wegman Canandaigua, LLC.(Nutter, John)
June 2, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by BME Associates.(Damia, Michael)
May 19, 2021 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against BME Associates, Reidman-Wegman Canandaigua, LLC, James Fahey Designs, filed by Cathey Conser. (JHF)
May 19, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATED ORDER granting #18 Motion to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 5/19/2021. (KAH)
May 18, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Substitute Party stipulated order by Cathey Conser. (Attachments: #1 first amended complaint)(Lambrix, Laurie)
May 5, 2021 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Hon. Marian W. Payson, United States Magistrate Judge, for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. The parties are encouraged to consider consenting to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Consent forms are available from the chambers of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 5/5/21. (ALJ)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Discontinuance as to UFP New York LLC. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 5/3/21. (JHF)
April 30, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Reidman-Wegman Canandaigua, LLC.(Nutter, John)
April 29, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Discontinuance by UFP New York LLC. (Pete, Brian)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Cathey Conser as to Reidman-Wegman Canandaigua, LLC, UFP New York LLC. (JHF)
April 19, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reidman-Wegman Canandaigua, LLC. (Nutter, John)
April 12, 2021 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Answer due date updated as to Reidman-Wegman Canandaigua, LLC answer due 4/30/2021. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 4/8/21. (JHF)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extend Time to Answer to April 30, 2021 by Reidman-Wegman Canandaigua, LLC. (Nutter, John)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The parties #8 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer is GRANTED. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint is due April 30, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/30/21. (ALJ)
March 30, 2021 Answer due date updated as to UFP New York LLC answer due 4/30/2021 (ALJ)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by UFP New York LLC. (Pete, Brian)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BME Associates. (Damia, Michael)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BME Associates.(Damia, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathey Conser. BME Associates served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (JHF)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to cause the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the Summons, #1 Complaint and this Order upon the named Defendants. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/3/21. (JHF)
March 4, 2021 Summons Reissued as to BME Associates, Reidman-Wegman Canandaigua, LLC, UFP New York LLC. Mailed to Buffalo USM for service. (JHF)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BME Associates, Reidman-Wegman Canandaigua, LLC, UFP New York LLC. (JD)
January 25, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
January 25, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
January 25, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cathy Conser.(Lambrix, Laurie)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cathy Conser. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lambrix, Laurie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conser v. Reidman-Wegman Canandaigua, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Conser
Represented By: Laurie Marie Lambrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathey Conser
Represented By: Laurie Marie Lambrix
Represented By: Kevin Bambury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reidman-Wegman Canandaigua, LLC
Represented By: John Cobb Nutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BME Associates
Represented By: Michael Damia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UFP New York LLC
Represented By: Brian Pete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Fahey Designs
Represented By: Brian F. Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?