U.S. Bank National Association v. Homestate Asset Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U. S. Bank National Association
Defendant: John Doe #1 through John Doe #12, Tyco Fire & Security (US) Management, Inc. doing business as Johnson Controls Fire Protection, Homestate Asset Management, LLC, Thomas Masaschi and Tyco Fire & Security (US) Management, Inc. d/b/a Johnson Controls Fire Protection
Case Number: 6:2021cv06271
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default by U. S. Bank National Association against Homestate Asset Management, LLC, Thomas Masaschi, Tyco Fire & Security (US) Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supporting Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Entry of Default, #3 Certificate of Service)(Shifton, Christina)
April 5, 2021 E-Filing Notification: Please note for future reference that the proper event is summons returned executed. No action required re #6 AFFIDAVIT of Service, #7 AFFIDAVIT of Service, and #8 AFFIDAVIT of Service. (TF)
April 2, 2021 RE #6 , #7 and #8 - SUMMONS Returned Executed by U. S. Bank National Association. Homestate Asset Management, LLC served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021; Thomas Masaschi served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021; Tyco Fire & Security (US) Management, Inc. served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. (TF)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint (with exhibits) and Notice of Pendency served on Thomas Masaschi on 03/26/2021, filed by U. S. Bank National Association. (Shifton, Christina)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint (with exhibits) and Notice of Pendency served on Tyco Fire & Security (US) Management Inc. on 03/26/2021, filed by U. S. Bank National Association. (Shifton, Christina)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint (with exhibits) and Notice of Pendency served on Homestate Asset Management LLC on 03/26/2021, filed by U. S. Bank National Association. (Shifton, Christina)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by U. S. Bank National Association (Shifton, Christina)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Homestate Asset Management, LLC, John Doe #1 through John Doe #12, Thomas Masaschi, Tyco Fire & Security (US) Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons)(SG)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KeyBank National Association, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION,; Corporate Parent Keycorp for KeyBank National Association.. (Shifton, Christina)
March 23, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG)
March 23, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by KeyBank National Association, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, (Shifton, Christina)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE, Homestate Asset Management, LLC, Thomas Masaschi, Tyco Fire & Security (US) Management, Inc. $ 402 receipt number 0209-4193415, filed by U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION,, KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Legal Description, #2 Exhibit 2 Multifamily Note, #3 Exhibit 3 Loan Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 Multifamily Mortgage, #5 Exhibit 5 Guaranty, #6 Exhibit 6 UCC Financing Stmt, #7 Exhibit 7 Assignment of Mortgage, #8 Exhibit 8 UCC Financing Stmt Assignment, #9 Exhibit 9 UCC Continuation, #10 Exhibit 10 Operating Agreement, #11 Exhibit 11 Assignment of Membership, #12 Exhibit 12 Default letter, #13 Exhibit 13 Acceleration letter, #14 Summons to Homestate Asset Management, #15 Summons to Tyco Fire & Security Management, #16 Summons to Thomas Masaschi, #17 Summons to Does 1-12, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shifton, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Homestate Asset Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1 through John Doe #12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire & Security (US) Management, Inc. doing business as Johnson Controls Fire Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homestate Asset Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Masaschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire & Security (US) Management, Inc. d/b/a Johnson Controls Fire Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U. S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Christina L. Shifton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?