Broecker d/b/a Widows Sons Masonic Riders Association et al v. Widows Sons Grand Chapter The King's Guard Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Widows Sons Masonic Riders Association, Inc., Frederick Broecker (individual) and Frederick Broecker d/b/a Widows Sons Masonic Riders Association
Defendant: The Alliance Widows Sons MRA Worldwide, Inc., Andreas M. Reynolds and Widows Sons Grand Chapter The King's Guard Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv06309
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT. Answer due date updated as to defendants. Answer due 6/7/2021. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 5/20/2021. (KJA)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Francis Allen on behalf of All Defendants (Allen, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet; Report to the USPTO; and Report to the Copyright Office served on the Widows Sons Grand Chapter Of The King's Guard Inc. on 04/19/2021, filed by Frederick Broecker (individual), Frederick Broecker d/b/a Widows Sons Masonic Riders Association, Widows Sons Masonic Riders Association, Inc.. (Stoyanov, Stefan)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet; Report to the USPTO; and Report to the Copyright Office served on he Alliance Widows Sons MRA Worldwide, Inc. on 04/19/2021, filed by Frederick Broecker (individual), Frederick Broecker d/b/a Widows Sons Masonic Riders Association, Widows Sons Masonic Riders Association, Inc.. (Stoyanov, Stefan)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet; Report to the USPTO; and Report to the Copyright Office served on Andreas M. Reynolds on 04/19/2021, filed by Frederick Broecker (individual), Frederick Broecker d/b/a Widows Sons Masonic Riders Association, Widows Sons Masonic Riders Association, Inc.. (Stoyanov, Stefan)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint,,, Report to the USPTO (ao120). (Stoyanov, Stefan)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to the Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JLV)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andreas M. Reynolds, The Alliance Widows Sons MRA Worldwide, Inc., Widows Sons Grand Chapter The King's Guard Inc. (JLV)
April 9, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JLV)
April 9, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JLV)
April 9, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JLV)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs $ 402 receipt number 0209-4212636, filed by Widows Sons Masonic Riders Association, Inc., Frederick Broecker d/b/a Widows Sons Masonic Riders Association, Frederick Broecker (individual). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Reg. VAu991-465, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #26 Summons, #27 Summons)(Stoyanov, Stefan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broecker d/b/a Widows Sons Masonic Riders Association et al v. Widows Sons Grand Chapter The King's Guard Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Widows Sons Masonic Riders Association, Inc.
Represented By: Stefan R. Stoyanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Broecker (individual)
Represented By: Stefan R. Stoyanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Broecker d/b/a Widows Sons Masonic Riders Association
Represented By: Stefan R. Stoyanov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Alliance Widows Sons MRA Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andreas M. Reynolds
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Widows Sons Grand Chapter The King's Guard Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?