Hill v. Annucci
Petitioner: Michael J. Hill
Respondent: Anthony J. Annucci
Case Number: 6:2021cv06373
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number ROC012962 (TF)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael J. Hill.(TF)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT administratively terminating the Petition. Signed by Clerk of Court on 5/18/2021. (mailed a copy of this judgment to petitioner) (TF)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate the Petition without filing it or assessing a filing fee. Petitioner is granted leave to reopen this case, no later than 30 days from entry of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to send an in forma pauperis motion form to Petitioner. Upon Petitioners submission of a prison certification or the $5.00 filing fee within 30 days, the Clerk of Court shall reopen this case without further order. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 5/17/2021. (mailed a copy of this order, and a form motion for ifp to petitioner) (TF)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael J. Hill.(TF)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael J. Hill.(TF)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for an Order to Show Cause by Michael J. Hill.(TF)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for immediate release by Michael J. Hill.(TF)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael J. Hill. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(TF)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Prisoner Pro Se packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael J. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anthony J. Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?