Houston v. City of Rochester et al
Plaintiff: mahogany houston
Defendant: City City of Rochester, Fastrac Markets LLC, City of Rochester and Rochester Police Dpt.
Case Number: 6:2021cv06377
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mark W Pedersen
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Pedersen for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 5/21/2021. (BK)
May 20, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Notice Letter to Court by City of Rochester, Rochester Police Dpt.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter)(Ash, Spencer)
May 11, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
May 11, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
May 11, 2021 Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Rochester from Monroe County Supreme Court, case number E2020010194. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Removal, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ash, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston v. City of Rochester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City City of Rochester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fastrac Markets LLC
Represented By: Spencer L. Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rochester
Represented By: Spencer L. Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Police Dpt.
Represented By: Spencer L. Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: mahogany houston
Represented By: Van Henri White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?