Mathews v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Kathy Mathews
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv06476
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Referring Judge: Marian W Payson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent Seven & I Holdings Co., Ltd, Corporate Parent SEI Speedway Holdings, LLC (DE), Corporate Parent SEJ Asset Management & Investment Company, Inc., Corporate Parent 7-Eleven, Inc. for Speedway LLC.. (Hannah, Brittany)
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Hon. Marian W. Payson. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/27/21. (JHF)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Speedway LLC Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction (Hannah, Brittany)
August 24, 2021 Filing 8 DISCOVERY PLAN by Speedway LLC.(Hannah, Brittany)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Philip Riter on behalf of Kathy Mathews (Riter, Kyle)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2021 at 12:00 PM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Counsel will be provided dial-in instructions by email prior to the conference.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 8/12/2021. (KAH)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Hon. Marian W. Payson, United States Magistrate Judge, for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. The parties are encouraged to consider consenting to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Consent forms are available from the Magistrate Judge's chambers or the Clerk of Court's office. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/6/2021. (MFM)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hannah, Brittany)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Speedway LLC re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hannah, Brittany)
July 9, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
July 9, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
July 9, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent Speedway LLC for Speedway LLC.. (Hannah, Brittany)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Speedway LLC from Monroe, case number E2021003143. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4296089), filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Hannah, Brittany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathews v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Mathews
Represented By: Kyle P. Riter
Represented By: Kyle Philip Riter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Brittany L. Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?