Delgado v. CDS Life Transitions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph D. Delgado
Defendant: CDS Life Transitions, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv06490
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marian W Payson
Referring Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2021 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Counsel will be provided dial-in instructions by email prior to the conference.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 9/15/2021. (KAH)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CDS Life Transitions, Inc.. (Nutter, John)
September 8, 2021 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson. The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. All non-dispositive motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 8/26/21. (KJA)
August 26, 2021 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CDS Life Transitions, Inc..(Nutter, John)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph D. Delgado. CDS Life Transitions, Inc. served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. (Hartt, James)
July 22, 2021 Case assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CDS Life Transitions, Inc. (LMD)
July 21, 2021 Notification to chambers of On-line case opening. Case assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. (LMD)
July 21, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (LMD)
July 21, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (LMD)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Joseph D. Delgado against CDS Life Transitions, Inc. $ 402 receipt number 0209-4307175, filed by Joseph D. Delgado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - US EEOC Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit B - US EEOC Right to Sue, #4 Proposed Summons)(Hartt, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. CDS Life Transitions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph D. Delgado
Represented By: James D. Hartt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDS Life Transitions, Inc.
Represented By: John Cobb Nutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?