Mosaic Health, Inc. v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mosaic Health, Inc.
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Lilly USA, LLC, Novo Nordisk Inc. and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Case Number: 6:2021cv06507
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn G. Nussbaum on behalf of Novo Nordisk Inc. (Nussbaum, Carolyn)
September 23, 2021 Filing 20 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #16 Amended MOTION to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Alyssa C. Kalisky Petitioner's Motion for pro hac vice admission - A. Kalisky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Oath of Office - A. Kalisky, #2 Exhibit Combined Registration Form - A. Kalisky)(D'Antonio, Thomas)
September 23, 2021 Filing 19 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #15 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Katie R. Lencioni ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4365117.) Petitioner's Motion for pro hac vice admission - K. Lencioni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Oath of Office - K. Lencioni, #2 Exhibit Combined Registration Form - K. Lencioni)(D'Antonio, Thomas)
September 23, 2021 Filing 18 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #14 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Daniel E. Laytin ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4365108.) Petitioner's Motion for pro hac vice admission- D. Laytin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Oath of Office - D. Laytin, #2 Exhibit Combined Registration Form - D. Laytin)(D'Antonio, Thomas)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER setting answer deadlines and briefing schedule. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to October 29, 2021. Plaintiff's opposition to any motion to dismiss is due December 17, 2021. Defendants' replies are due January 14, 2022. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 09/21/2021. (CDH)
September 21, 2021 E-Filing Notification: #14 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Daniel E. Laytin. ACTION REQUIRED: Refile the following documents using the attorney's actual signature: Petitioner's Motion for pro hac vice admission, Oath of Office and Attorney Database & Electronic Case Filing Registration Form. Use Continuation of Exhibits. (DDS)
September 21, 2021 E-Filing Notification: #15 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Katie R. Lencioni ACTION REQUIRED: Refile the following documents using the attorney's actual signature: Petitioner's Motion for pro hac vice admission, Oath of Office and Attorney Database & Electronic Case Filing Registration Form. Use Continuation of Exhibits. (DDS)
September 21, 2021 E-Filing Notification: #16 Amended MOTION to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Alyssa C. Kalisky ACTION REQUIRED: Refile the following documents using the attorney's actual signature: Petitioner's Motion for pro hac vice admission, Oath of Office and Attorney Database & Electronic Case Filing Registration Form. Use Continuation of Exhibits. (DDS)
September 20, 2021 Filing 16 Amended MOTION to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Alyssa C. Kalisky by Eli Lilly and Company, Lilly USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion and Supporting Papers Seeking Admission Pro Hac Vice)(D'Antonio, Thomas)
September 20, 2021 Filing 15 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Katie R. Lencioni ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4365117.) by Eli Lilly and Company, Lilly USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion and Supporting Papers Seeking Admission Pro Hac Vice)(D'Antonio, Thomas)
September 20, 2021 Filing 14 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Daniel E. Laytin ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4365108.) by Eli Lilly and Company, Lilly USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion and Supporting Papers Seeking Admission Pro Hac Vice)(D'Antonio, Thomas)
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Alyssa Kalisky ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4365051.) by Eli Lilly and Company, Lilly USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion and Supporting Papers Seeking Admission Pro Hac Vice)(D'Antonio, Thomas)
September 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S. D'Antonio on behalf of Eli Lilly and Company, Lilly USA, LLC (D'Antonio, Thomas)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, jointly proposing briefing schedule and response dates for all motions to dismiss from all parties, by Eli Lilly and Company, Lilly USA, LLC. (D'Antonio, Thomas)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mosaic Health, Inc.. Novo Nordisk Inc. waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Feldman, Brian)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mosaic Health, Inc.. Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Feldman, Brian)
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Kaitlin Naughton. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 08/19/2021. (DJP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Ellen Meriwether. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 08/19/2021. (DJP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mosaic Health, Inc.. Eli Lilly and Company waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; Lilly USA, LLC waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Feldman, Brian)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4329259.) by Mosaic Health, Inc..(Feldman, Brian)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4329248.) by Mosaic Health, Inc..(Feldman, Brian)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Eli Lilly and Company, Lilly USA, LLC, Novo Nordisk Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. (TMK)
August 2, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
August 2, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
August 2, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
July 31, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mosaic Health, Inc.. (Feldman, Brian)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Eli Lilly and Company, Lilly USA, LLC, Novo Nordisk Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC $ 402 receipt number 0209-4318509, filed by Mosaic Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Feldman, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosaic Health, Inc. v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mosaic Health, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Marc Feldman
Represented By: Ellen Meriwether
Represented By: Kaitlin Naughton
Represented By: Lauren Renee Mendolera
Represented By: Samuel P. Reger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Represented By: Alyssa C. Kalisky
Represented By: Daniel Laytin
Represented By: Katie R Lencioni
Represented By: Thomas S. D'Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilly USA, LLC
Represented By: Alyssa C. Kalisky
Represented By: Daniel Laytin
Represented By: Katie R Lencioni
Represented By: Thomas S. D'Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn G. Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?