Shumway v. Cellular Sales Services Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Daniel M. Shumway
Defendant: Cellular Sales Services Group, LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv06509
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Cellular Sales Services Group, LLC answer due 10/14/2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/3/21. (BJJ)
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Summons Returned Executed Letter to Hon. Frank P. Geraci requesting extension to respond to Complaint up to and including October 14, 2021 by Cellular Sales Services Group, LLC.(Martin, Christopher)
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cellular Sales Services Group, LLC. (Martin, Christopher)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole E. Haimson on behalf of Cellular Sales Services Group, LLC (Haimson, Nicole)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Martin on behalf of Cellular Sales Services Group, LLC (Martin, Christopher)
August 31, 2021 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel M. Shumway. Cellular Sales Services Group, LLC served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. (Hartt, James)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to Cellular Sales Services Group, LLC. (JLV)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Daniel M. Shumway. Amendment to #2 Summons Issued Due to Rejection of Original Summons. (Hartt, James)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel M. Shumway. Cellular Sales Services Group, LLC served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (Hartt, James)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cellular Sales Services Group, LLC. (TMK)
August 3, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
August 3, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
August 3, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Daniel M Shumway against Cellular Sales Services Group, LLC $ 402 receipt number 0209-4319303, filed by Daniel M. Shumway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- US EEOC Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit B - NYSDHR Determination Probable Cause, #4 Proposed Summons)(Hartt, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shumway v. Cellular Sales Services Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel M. Shumway
Represented By: James D. Hartt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellular Sales Services Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Martin
Represented By: Nicole E. Haimson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?