Greene v. Orange et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Donald Greene
Defendant: Joseph Eric Orange, Bobby Russell, Steven A. McGraw, James Phipps, United Health Care, Christopher W. Roop and Vinton Animal Control
Case Number: 6:2021cv06553
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 CLERKS CERTIFICATE/INDEX filed and electronically sent to Court of Appeals (TF)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Judgment, #3 Order, by Joseph Donald Greene. Fee not paid. (TF)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 JUDGMENT in favor of United Health Care, Vinton Animal Control, Bobby Russell, Christopher W. Roop, James Phipps, Joseph Eric Orange, Steven A. McGraw against Joseph Donald Greene. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court, on 9/9/2021. Clerk mailed a copy of this judgment and the notice of filing to the plaintiff. (LB)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER The Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to send to Plaintiff a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel is denied without prejudice torenew; and it is further ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he shall so notify this Court, in writing, no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. This writing must include either (1) a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required certification of Plaintiffs inmate trust fund account (or the institutional equivalent) and authorization form or (2) the $350.00 filing fee and the $52.00 administrative fee ($402.00 total); and it is further ORDERED that upon Plaintiffs submission of either (1) a motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required certification of Plaintiffs inmate trust fund account and authorization form or (2) the $350.00 filing fee and the $52.00 administrative fee ($402.00 total), the Clerk of Court shall reopen this case without further order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 9/8/2021. Clerk mailed to plaintiff this order, the notice of filing, and the form motion as directed. (LB)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Joseph Donald Greene.(TF)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joseph Donald Greene.(TF)
August 25, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Prisoner Pro Se packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Orange et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Donald Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Eric Orange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Phipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher W. Roop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinton Animal Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?