Williams v. Latona et al
Defendant: Letita James
Petitioner: Shaka Williams
Respondent: L. Latona
Case Number: 6:2021cv06588
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Remark: Document 8 mailed to the Northern District of New York (Syracuse). (KM)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Shaka Williams. (KM)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER transferring the case to the United States District Court in the Northern District of New York. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 9/23/2021. (Clerk mailed a copy of this order with the NEF to Petitioner, Shaka Williams. )(LMD)
September 24, 2021 Case transferred to District of Northern New York. Case closed. (LMD)
September 24, 2021 This case has been opened in the Northern District of New York (Syracuse) as 9:21-cv-01058. (LMD)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Assistance to File by Shaka Williams.(KM)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shaka Williams.(KM)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number BUF073444. (KM)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Shaka Williams. (KM)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 Letter from Shaka Williams, dated 9/13/2021, to Your Honor. (KM)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Shaka Williams. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KM)
September 15, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
September 15, 2021 Petitioner mailed Pro Se Packet which included: Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline. (KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Latona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shaka Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letita James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L. Latona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?