Brennan v. Hyzon Motors Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Brennan
Defendant: Hyzon Motors Inc., Decarbonization Plus Acquisition Corporation, Erik Anderson, Peter Haskopoulos, Craig Knight and Mark Gordon
Case Number: 6:2021cv06636
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER. On November 29, 2021, a proposed Stipulation and Order (ECF No. 6) was filed in case 21-CV-6612-CJS. The Court intends to sign that proposed order within the next few days. Also pending before the Court are motions for consolidation of cases 21-CV-6612-CJS, 21-CV-6636-CJS and 21-CV-6695-CJS. The motions to consolidate were all filed in case 21-CV-6612-CJS. (ECF Nos. 7). There does not appear to be any objection to the Court consolidating the cases. However, there is an apparent dispute between the proposed class members regarding the appointment of a lead plaintiff. Four motions for appointment of a lead plaintiff have been filed, again, all in case 21-CV-6612-CJS: ECF No. 7, motion by David Levy; EFF No. 8, motion by Muhammad Samir Jassim Osman; ECF No. 10, motion by Alfred Miller, and ECF No. 13, motion by Douglas Brown. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before December 8, 2021, counsel shall notify the Court in writing whether there is any objection to the consolidation of the cases, and, if not, shall submit a proposed order consolidating the actions. It is further ORDERED that on or before December 8, 2021, counsel shall confer and provide the Court will a proposed briefing schedule concerning the motions for appointment of a lead plaintiff. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 12/3/21. (KAP)
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy A. Lieberman on behalf of Mark Brennan (Lieberman, Jeremy)
October 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Erik Anderson, Mark Gordon, Peter Haskopoulos, Hyzon Motors Inc., Craig Knight. (TMK)
October 14, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
October 14, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
October 14, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Erik Anderson, Mark Gordon, Peter Haskopoulos, Hyzon Motors Inc. f/k/a Decarbonization Plus Acquisition Corporation, Craig Knight $ 402 receipt number 0209-4388317, filed by Mark Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hood ll, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brennan v. Hyzon Motors Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyzon Motors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decarbonization Plus Acquisition Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Haskopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Brennan
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood ll
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Represented By: Peretz Bronstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?