ProNexus, LLC v. Swyft, Inc.
Plaintiff: PRONEXUS, LLC
Defendant: SWYFT, INC.
Case Number: 6:2021cv06647
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Swyft, Inc..(Kohn, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Kohn on behalf of Swyft, Inc. (Kohn, Daniel)
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ProNexus, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Professional Resources, Inc. for ProNexus, LLC.. (Hooks, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ProNexus, LLC. Swyft, Inc. served on 10/27/2021, answer due 11/17/2021. (Hooks, Robert)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Swyft, Inc. (LMD)
October 22, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (LMD)
October 22, 2021 Notification to chambers of on-line case opening. Case assigned to Hon. David G. Larimer. (LMD)
October 22, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (LMD)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SWYFT, INC. $ 402 receipt number 0209-4395935, filed by PRONEXUS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hooks, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ProNexus, LLC v. Swyft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRONEXUS, LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWYFT, INC.
Represented By: Daniel Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?