Oates v. Fradette et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Oates
Defendant: C.O. K. Fradette, C.O. J. Benjamin and C.O. Z. Pipe
Case Number: 6:2021cv06649
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 JUDGMENT administratively terminating the case. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 11/23/21. (Copy of this Judgment and blank in forma pauperis application form that includes the Certification sent by First Class Mail to plaintiff at Five Points).(RE)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis., Plaintif's renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, Docket Item 5, is denied without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action without filing the Complaint or assessing a filing fee. The Court will grant Plaintiff a final opportunity to fix his errors, and Plaintiff has until December 20, 2021 to either (1) submit a signed Certification or (2) pay the $402.00 in filing fees. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this deadline, this case will be dismissed without prejudice. To assist Plaintiff, the Clerk of Court shall send Plaintiff a blank in forma pauperis application form that includes the Certification. Upon submission of the certification or the filing fee by December 20, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall reopen this case without further order. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 11/22/21. Copy of this NEF and order mailed to pro se plaintiff at Five Points. (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Oates.(TF)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 JUDGMENT in favor of J. Benjamin, K. Fradette, Z. Pipe against Joseph Oates. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 10/27/2021. (Clerk mailed a copy of this Judgment, the NEF and the blank Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis with authorization to Plaintiff, Joseph Oates at Five Points Correctional Facility.) (LMD)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively terminate this action without filing the complaint or assessing filing fee. If plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he shall so notify this Court in writing, no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. Upon plaintiff's submission of either the required certification or the filing fee, the Clerk shall reopen this case without further order. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 10/26/21. Copy of this NEF and order mailed to pro se plaintiff at Five Points. (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Oates. (JHF)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J. Benjamin, K. Fradette, Z. Pipe, filed by Joseph Oates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JHF)
October 21, 2021 Prisoner Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (JHF)
October 21, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oates v. Fradette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. K. Fradette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. J. Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Z. Pipe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?