Colon v. Bermudez et al
Plaintiff: Fredrick Colon
Defendant: Alexis Bermudez and Daniel Rizzo
Case Number: 6:2021cv06664
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Fredrick Colon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fredrick Colon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Reopen Case by Fredrick Colon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fredrick Colon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 JUDGMENT administratively terminating the case. Signed by Clerk on 11/1/21. (JHF)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: As discussed herein, Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice; the Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action without filing the Complaint or assessing a filing fee; the Clerk of Court is directed to send to Plaintiff a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation; and if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he shall so notify this Court, in writing, no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court shall also send Plaintiff a copy of this order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 11/1/2021. (MFM)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 1, 2021 Clerk mailed copy of #3 order, #4 judgment and a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation to plaintiff. (JHF)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 Letter from Fredrick Colon, dated 10/14/21, to Clerk. (JHF)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexis Bermudez, Daniel Rizzo, filed by Fredrick Colon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JHF)
October 27, 2021 Prisoner Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (JHF)
October 27, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colon v. Bermudez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Bermudez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Rizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?