Van Bortel et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Mary Catherine Van Bortel, Kitty Van Bortel and Howard G. Van Bortel
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv06739
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Remark: Pursuant to the parties' joint agreement and the Court's Text Order (Dkt. #7) filed 2/3/22, the response and reply deadlines to the #8 MOTION to Dismiss have already been agreed upon and, therefore, the Court will not issue a formal briefing schedule. (PR)
February 3, 2022 Filing 8 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law In Support Of Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Declaration in Support of Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C September 1, 2021 Correspondence, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D NYS Department of State Division of Corporations Entity Information)(Fazio, Peter)
February 3, 2022 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting the parties' joint #6 Letter Request to file a dispositive motion. Defendant's motion to dismiss must be filed by 2/3/2022; Responses due by 3/3/2022; Replies due by 3/17/2022. The Court will review the papers to determine if argument is needed and if so, the parties will be contacted for scheduling. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 2/3/22. (PR)
January 28, 2022 Filing 6 Letter filed by Ford Motor Company as to Ford Motor Company Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule in Reference to Ford Motor Company's Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss. (Fazio, Peter)
January 26, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Ford Motor Company's time to Respond to the Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Fazio, Peter)
January 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven H. Blatt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Blatt, Steven)
December 15, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
December 15, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
December 15, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. David G. Larimer. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Notice of Removal, Index Of Documents Pursuant To Local Rule 81(a) (A). (Fazio, Peter)
December 14, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Ford Motor Company.. (Fazio, Peter)
December 14, 2021 E-Filing Notification: re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - Action Required: Attorney is directed to file an index identifying State Court documents pursuant to local rule 81(A). (TMK)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from New York Supreme Court Monroe County, case number E2021/010285. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4441857), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Amended Complaint)(Fazio, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Bortel et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Catherine Van Bortel
Represented By: Leonard A. Bellavia
Represented By: Steven H. Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kitty Van Bortel
Represented By: Leonard A. Bellavia
Represented By: Steven H. Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard G. Van Bortel
Represented By: Leonard A. Bellavia
Represented By: Steven H. Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Peter Joseph Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?