Bosch v. Hartford Life Group Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Theresa Bosch
Defendant: Hartford Life Group Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2021cv06743
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 1/19/2022. (TF)
January 18, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Theresa Bosch (Pfaff, E.)
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life Group Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc. for Hartford Life Group Insurance Company.. (Downey, Brian)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hartford Life Group Insurance Company. Hartford Life Group Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/20/2021, answer due 2/18/2022. (Downey, Brian)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Downey on behalf of Hartford Life Group Insurance Company (Downey, Brian)
December 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life Group Insurance Company. (TMK)
December 20, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
December 20, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
December 20, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint Summons to be issued by clerk. (Pfaff, E.)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life Group Insurance Company $ 402 receipt number 0209-4445593, filed by Theresa Bosch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pfaff, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bosch v. Hartford Life Group Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Bosch
Represented By: E. Peter Pfaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life Group Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian P. Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?