Penn-Star Insurance Company v. FPM Realty LLC et al
Plaintiff: Penn-Star Insurance Company
Defendant: FPM Realty LLC, Rosewood Realty Rochester LLC, Gateway Property Solutions, Ltd., Mussumeci Electric, Inc., Fros Air Conditioning & Heating, Inc., LME Inc., Larry Masci Electric, Inc. and ABJ Fire Protection Co.
Case Number: 6:2022cv06169
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE by Mussumeci Electric, Inc. of change of law firm name and facsimile number (Schiffmacher, Jennifer)
May 9, 2022 Filing 56 TEXT ORDER granting letter request for extension of time. By no later than June 13, 2022, Plaintiff shall show cause as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 05/09/2022. (MGB)
May 5, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer V. Schiffmacher on behalf of Mussumeci Electric, Inc. (Schiffmacher, Jennifer)
May 3, 2022 E-Filing Notification: #52 Notice of Substitution of Counsel: Jennifer V. Schiffmacher. Clerk did not substitute attorneys because the document does not comply with Local Rule 83.2(c)(1). A stipulation will effectuate a substitution only where counsel certify that a successor attorney has already or will simultaneously file a notice of appearance, no evidentiary hearing or trial date has been scheduled, and the withdrawal/substitution will not require amendment of case management order deadlines. ACTION REQUIRED: Refile this document with the appropriate certification or file a motion in accordance with L.R.Civ.P. 83.2(c)(3). (RE)
May 2, 2022 Filing 54 Notice of Substitution of Counsel: Valerie L. Barbic is substituted for Scott W. Driver. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP. (Barbic, Valerie)
May 2, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie L. Barbic on behalf of ABJ Fire Protection Co. (Barbic, Valerie)
May 2, 2022 Filing 52 Notice of Substitution of Counsel: Jennifer V. Schiffmacher is substituted for Arlene E. Lewis. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP (Schiffmacher, Jennifer)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is directed to show cause, through the filing of an amended complaint and a supporting legal memorandum on or before Thursday, May 12, 2022, as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 4/25/22. (RE)
April 11, 2022 Filing 50 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00975.
April 11, 2022 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
April 11, 2022 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
April 9, 2022 Case transferred to District of Western, New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Guy, Alicia) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: The R&R #45 is adopted in its entirety, with the exception of the discussion of Penn-Star's motion to strike. Accordingly, FPM's motion for transfer (ECF No. #33 ) is granted. Penn-Star's motion to strike FPM's Fifth Affirmative Defense (ECF No. #27 ) is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. ORDER ATTACHED. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 3/31/2022. (Guy, Alicia) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 25, 2022 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #48 : Discovery is stayed pending Judge Komitee's ruling on this Court's Report and Recommendation #45 recommending venue transfer. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/25/2022. (Nordstrom, Britta) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 24, 2022 Filing 48 Letter MOTION for Discovery Conference and Extension of Deadlines by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 22, 2022 Filing 47 Letter Responding to Plaintiff Objections dated 3/8/22 by FPM Realty LLC (Nonkes, James) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 8, 2022 Filing 46 OBJECTION to #45 Report and Recommendations filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
February 24, 2022 Filing 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #27 - #33 : Per the attached Report and Recommendation, the Court respectfully recommends that the District Court deny plaintiff's motion to strike defendant FPM Realty LLC's Fifth Affirmative Defense and grant defendant's motion to transfer venue. Objections to R&R due by 3/10/2022. Failure to file objections within the specified time waives the right to appeal the District Court's order. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/24/2022. (Nordstrom, Britta) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
February 24, 2022 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #44 : The parties' requested extension to complete discovery is granted. In light of #45 , the conference originally set for 3/9/2022 is adjourned sine die. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/24/2022. (Nordstrom, Britta) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by FPM Realty LLC. (Nonkes, James) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
January 3, 2022 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #43 : Parties to complete discovery by 2/14/2022. The conference originally set for 1/19/2022 before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak is adjourned to 3/9/2022 at 11:15 AM. Conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 11:15 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 21-0975. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/3/2022. (Nordstrom, Britta) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
December 30, 2021 Filing 43 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by FPM Realty LLC. (Nonkes, James) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
November 16, 2021 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #42 : Parties are to complete discovery by 12/30/2021. A Status Conference is set for 1/19/2022 at 10:45 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 10:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 21-0975. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/16/2021. (Nordstrom, Britta) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
November 15, 2021 Filing 42 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by FPM Realty LLC. (Nonkes, James) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Picciotti on behalf of FPM Realty LLC (aty to be noticed) (Picciotti, Joseph) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 40 Letter Joint Submission re Status of Discovery by Penn-Star Insurance Company (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
October 1, 2021 ELECTRONIC ORDER re #40 : Parties' request for an extension regarding discovery is granted. Parties are to file a status report by 11/15/2021. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/1/2021. (Nordstrom, Britta) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
July 26, 2021 Filing 39 Letter Follow-Up from 7/23/21 Teleconference by FPM Realty LLC (Nonkes, James) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
July 26, 2021 MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference proceeding held before Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak on 7/23/2021. Appearance for plaintiff: Steven Verveniotis. Appearance for defendant: James Nonkes (for FPM); George Maniatis (for Gateway); Arlene Lewis (for Mussumeci Electric); Ryan Maxwell (for Larry Masci Electric, Inc.); Scott Driver (for ABJ). Parties to exchange document requests and interrogatories within 30 days - responses 30 days thereafter. Status report due 10/1/2021. (FTR: 12:02 - 12:25) (Caggiano, Diana) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
July 18, 2021 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Mussumeci Electric, Inc.. (Lewis, Arlene) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 37 Letter to Judge Pollak responding to Plaintiff's 6/26/21 letter (Dkt 35) and enclosing courtesy copies of Defendant FPM's papers (Dkts 33 & 36) by FPM Realty LLC (Nonkes, James) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 36 REPLY in Support re #33 MOTION to Strike and Transfer Venue filed by FPM Realty LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Nonkes, James) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 35 Letter to Judge Pollak Enclosing Courtesy Copies of Penn Star's Moving Papers in Support of Penn-Star Insurance Company's Motion to Strike FPM's Fifth Affirmative Defense as to Venue and Penn-Star's Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Penn-Star Insurance Company's Motion to Strike FPM's Fifth Affirmative Defense as to Venue and in Opposition to FPM's Motion to Transfer Venue by Penn-Star Insurance Company (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
June 25, 2021 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support re #33 MOTION to Strike and Transfer Venue, #27 MOTION to Strike FPM's Fifth Affirmative Defense as to Venue Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Penn-Star Insurance Company's Motion to Strike FPM's Fifth Affirmative Defense as to Venue and in Opposition to FPM's Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - SDNY Local Rules) (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER TO ANSWER re #32 answer due 7/19/2021. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/22/2021. (Caggiano, Diana) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION to Strike and Transfer Venue by FPM Realty LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph Picciotti, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Joseph Picciotti, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Joseph Picciotti, #4 Exhibit C to Affidavit of Joseph Picciotti, #5 Affidavit of Mike Diskind, #6 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Mike Diskind, #7 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Mike Diskind, #8 Exhibit C to Affidavit of Mike Diskind, #9 Memorandum in Support) (Nonkes, James) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
June 21, 2021 Filing 32 Letter REQUESTING LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER by Mussumeci Electric, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lewis, Arlene) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Mussumeci Electric, Inc.. (Lewis, Arlene) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
June 16, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Larry Masci Electric, Inc.. (Maxwell, Ryan) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
June 15, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Arlene E. Lewis on behalf of Mussumeci Electric, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Lewis, Arlene) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint by ABJ Fire Protection Co.. (Driver, Scott) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
June 8, 2021 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant ABJ Fire Protection Co. to answer, move, or otherwise respond by 7/2/2021. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/8/2021. (Bayer, Sarah) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Strike FPM's Fifth Affirmative Defense as to Venue by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Motion to Strike, #2 Exhibit A - April 15, 2021 E-mail, #3 Exhibit B - April 15, 2021 E-mail, #4 Exhibit C - April 16, 2021 E-mail, #5 Exhibit D - April 19, 2021 E-mail, #6 Exhibit E - FPM's Counsel's E-mail, #7 Exhibit F - Verveniotis' E-mail, #8 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Penn-Star Insurance Company's Motion to Strike FPM's Fifth Affirmative Defense as to Venue) (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ABJ Fire Protection Co.. (Driver, Scott) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
June 3, 2021 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The parties' stipulation is So Ordered. Defendant Larry Masci Electric, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond by 6/28/2021. Status Conference set for 7/23/2021 @ 11:45 AM. Conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 11:45 AM. Enter access code 380-1746 and security code 21-0975. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/3/2021. (Bayer, Sarah) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 25 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, with Request to So Order Stipulation by Larry Masci Electric, Inc.. (Maxwell, Ryan) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
May 10, 2021 MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Conference proceeding re #22 held before Chief Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak on 5/7/2021. Appearance for plaintiff: Steven Verveniotis. Appearances for defendants: James Nonkes and Joe Picciotti (for FPM) (attorney advised to notice appearance); George Maniatis (for Gateway); Valerie Barbic (for ABJ) (attorney advised to notice appearance). Plaintiff to file motion to strike in 30 days. Defendant FPM's response and cross-motion due 15 thereafter. Plaintiff's reply due 1 week thereafter. Parties to exchange initial disclosures within 30 days. (FTR: 10:55 - 11:18) (Caggiano, Diana) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING MOTION: The Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document (move to strike FPM 5th affirmative defense) #22 filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company and any anticipated motion practice is respectfully referred to Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak for a decision. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 4/28/2021. (Guy, Alicia) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
April 22, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by George Maniatis on behalf of Gateway Property Solutions Ltd (aty to be noticed) (Maniatis, George) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document (move to strike FPM 5th affirmative defense) Letter Response in Opposition to Letter Motion filed by FPM Realty LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J. Picciotti Email to Penn-Star Counsel) (Nonkes, James) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 22 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document (move to strike FPM 5th affirmative defense) by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, Answer Defenses and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant FPM Realty LLC by FPM Realty LLC. (Nonkes, James) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by James Peter Nonkes on behalf of FPM Realty LLC (aty to be noticed) (Nonkes, James) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 19 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant ABJ Fire Protection Co., FPM Realty LLC, Fros Air Conditioning & Heating, Inc., LME Inc., Larry Masci Electric, Inc., Mussumeci Electric, Inc., Rosewood Realty Rochester, LLC has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant ABJ Fire Protection Co., FPM Realty LLC, Fros Air Conditioning & Heating, Inc., LME Inc., Larry Masci Electric, Inc., Mussumeci Electric, Inc., Rosewood Realty Rochester, LLC is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 5/7/2021 @ 10:45 AM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 10:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 21-0975. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/6/2021. (Caggiano, Diana) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 17 Request for Certificate of Default by Penn-Star Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Request for Certificate of Default, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summonses, #4 Exhibit AOS - FPM, #5 Exhibit AOS - Rosewood, #6 Exhibit AOS - Mussumeci, #7 Exhibit AOS - FROS, #8 Exhibit AOS - LME, #9 Exhibit AOS - Masci, #10 Exhibit AOS - ABJ, #11 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default) (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gateway Property Solutions Ltd (Sambursky, Neil) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Gateway Property Solutions Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rule 7.1 Disclosure) (Sambursky, Neil) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 25, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Gateway Property Solutions Ltd served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. ABJ Fire Protection Co. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Larry Masci Electric, Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. LME Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Fros Air Conditioning & Heating, Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Mussumeci Electric, Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Rosewood Realty Rochester, LLC served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. FPM Realty LLC served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021. (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,,,, by Penn-Star Insurance Company (Verveniotis, Steven) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Other Affiliate United National Group, Other Affiliate Diamond State Insurance Company, Other Affiliate United America Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Penn-America Insurance Company, Other Affiliate United National Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Global Indemnity Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Penn-America Group Inc., Other Affiliate Penn-Patriot Insurance Company, Other Affiliate United National Casualty Insurance Company for PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY. (Miranda, Michael) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABJ FIRE PROTECTION CO., FPM REALTY LLC, FROS AIR CONDITIONING & HEATING, INC., GATEWAY PROPERTY SOLUTIONS LTD, LARRY MASCI ELECTRIC, INC., LME INC., MUSSUMECI ELECTRIC, INC., ROSEWOOD REALTY ROCHESTER, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14188009 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by PENN-STAR INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for FPM Realty LLC, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Rosewood Realty Rochester, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Gateway Property Solutions LTD, #4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Mussumeci Electric, Inc., #5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Fros Air Conditioning & Heating, Inc., #6 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for LME Inc., #7 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Larry Masci Electric, Inc., #8 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for ABJ Fire Protection Co., #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Miranda, Michael) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
February 23, 2021 Your proposed summonses were not issued for the following reason: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]
February 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from nyed on 4/11/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penn-Star Insurance Company v. FPM Realty LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penn-Star Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven Verveniotis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FPM Realty LLC
Represented By: James P. Nonkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosewood Realty Rochester LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Property Solutions, Ltd.
Represented By: George Maniatis
Represented By: Neil L. Sambursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mussumeci Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Arlene E. Lewis
Represented By: Jennifer V. Schiffmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fros Air Conditioning & Heating, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LME Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Masci Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABJ Fire Protection Co.
Represented By: Scott William Driver
Represented By: Valerie L. Barbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?