Roper v. Sutherland Global Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bobby Roper
Defendant: Sutherland Global Services, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2022cv06310
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Carter Hastings ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4671589.) by Bobby Roper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Mullin, Robert)
September 12, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4671578.) by Bobby Roper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit)(Mullin, Robert)
September 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Edward Bowdler on behalf of Sutherland Global Services, Inc. (Bowdler, Bryan)
September 7, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Robert L. Mullin on behalf of Bobby Roper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Megan Aaron Consent)(Mullin, Robert)
September 7, 2022 E-Filing Notification: #8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons &Complaint, incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use SUMMONS Returned Executed event. No action required. (RE)
September 7, 2022 SUMMONS Returned Executed #8 by Bobby Roper. Sutherland Global Services, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (RE)
September 6, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons &Complaint served on Denise Dube, Authorized Agent on August 1, 2022, filed by Bobby Roper. (Mullin, Robert)
August 15, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Robert L. Mullin on behalf of Bobby Roper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kilgore, Shana Consent, #2 Exhibit Paulsen, Jason Consent, #3 Exhibit Tiger, Kimberly Consent)(Mullin, Robert)
July 22, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sutherland Global Services, Inc. (RE)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Bobby Roper. Civil Cover Sheet filed by Bobby Roper. (Mullin, Robert)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Robert L. Mullin on behalf of Bobby Roper. (Attachments: #1 Consent to join, #2 Consent to join, #3 Consent to join, #4 Consent to join, #5 Consent to join, #6 Consent to join, #7 Consent to join, #8 Consent to join, #9 Consent to join, #10 Consent to join, #11 Consent to join, #12 Consent to join)(Mullin, Robert)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 Original Summons Filed. (Mullin, Robert)
July 22, 2022 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(RE)
July 22, 2022 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (RE)
July 22, 2022 Case Assigned to Hon. David G. Larimer. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (RE)
July 21, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Mullin, Robert)
July 21, 2022 E-Filing Notification: #1 COMPLAINT- filing Attorney is directed to submit summonses for issuance, please use the Original Summons Filed event, found under Service of Process. (RE)
July 21, 2022 E-Filing Notification: #1 COMPLAINT - filing Attorney is directed to file a civil cover sheet, pursuant to Local Rule 3. No judge assignment will be made until filing is entered on the docket. Please utilize the Continuation of Exhibits event, located within the Responses and Replies category. (RE)
July 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sutherland Global Services, Inc. $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4631371, filed by Bobby Roper.(Mullin, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roper v. Sutherland Global Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Roper
Represented By: Robert L. Mullin
Represented By: Carter T. Hastings
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutherland Global Services, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Edward Bowdler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?