MC Management of Rochester LLC., et al v. Biden et al
Plaintiff: MC Management of Rochester LLC.,, Pane Vino LLC.,, Pharaohs GC Inc.,, Veneto Westside LLC.,, MJM Fitch, Inc.,, 759 Canandaigua, Inc.,, Grand Central Wine Bar, LLC.,, William James Development Corp.,, Raphael's Corp., and WMK Management, Inc.,
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Nancy Pelosi, Charles Schumer, Kevin McCarthy, Mitch McConnell, Isabel Casillas Guzman and The United States Small Business Administration,
Case Number: 6:2022cv06337
Filed: August 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grand Central Wine Bar, LLC.,, Pane Vino LLC.,, MC Management of Rochester LLC.,, 759 Canandaigua, Inc.,, Pharaohs GC Inc.,, Raphael's Corp.,, William James Development Corp.,, Veneto Westside LLC.,, WMK Management, Inc.,, MJM Fitch, Inc.,. All Defendants. (Cohen, Steven)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 759 Canandaigua, Inc.,, Grand Central Wine Bar, LLC.,, MC Management of Rochester LLC.,, MJM Fitch, Inc.,, Pane Vino LLC.,, Pharaohs GC Inc.,, Raphael's Corp.,, Veneto Westside LLC.,, WMK Management, Inc.,, William James Development Corp.,. (Hogan, Corey)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Joseph R. Biden, Isabel Casillas Guzman, Kevin McCarthy, Mitch McConnell, Nancy Pelosi, Charles Schumer, The United States Small Business Administration. (TMK)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Attachments: #1 Original Summons Filed, #2 Original Summons Filed, #3 Original Summons Filed, #4 Original Summons Filed, #5 Original Summons Filed, #6 Original Summons Filed)(Hogan, Corey)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4648650, filed by GRAND CENTRAL WINE BAR, LLC, PANE VINO LLC, MC MANAGEMENT OF ROCHESTER LLC, 759 CANANDAIGUA, INC., PHARAOHS GC INC., RAPHAELS CORP., WILLIAM JAMES DEVELOPMENT CORP., VENETO WESTSIDE LLC, WMK MANAGEMENT, INC., MJM FITCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hogan, Corey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MC Management of Rochester LLC., et al v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MC Management of Rochester LLC.,
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pane Vino LLC.,
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pharaohs GC Inc.,
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veneto Westside LLC.,
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MJM Fitch, Inc.,
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 759 Canandaigua, Inc.,
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Central Wine Bar, LLC.,
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William James Development Corp.,
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raphael's Corp.,
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WMK Management, Inc.,
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Pelosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabel Casillas Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Small Business Administration,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?