Harrison v. Sword et al
Plaintiff: Michael Harrison
Defendant: ORC. J. Sword, SORC. T. Gallagher, C.O. R. Eastman, Sgt. Harris, Lt. Boeck and Superintendent Leanne Latona
Case Number: 6:2022cv06485
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
November 22, 2022 Filing 5 JUDGMENT administratively terminating the action. Signed by Clerk on 11/22/22. (JHF)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; administratively terminating the action. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he shall pay the filing fee of $402.00, or notify the Court in writing as directed no latter than 30 days from the date of this order. Along with this order, Clerk directed to send to Plaintiff a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation and authorization form. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 11/22/22. (JHF)
November 22, 2022 Clerk mailed copy of #4 order, #5 judgment and a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation and authorization form to plaintiff. (JHF)
November 21, 2022 E-Filing Notification: Clerk revised docket text of #3 to "Authorization" per Pro Se Office. (JHF)
November 17, 2022 Filing 3 Authorization in re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF) Modified on 11/21/2022 (JHF).
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Harrison. (JHF)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boeck, R. Eastman, T. Gallagher, Harris, Leanne Latona, J. Sword, filed by Michael Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (JHF)
November 3, 2022 Prisoner Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (JHF)
November 3, 2022 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Sword et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORC. J. Sword
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SORC. T. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. R. Eastman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Boeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Leanne Latona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?