Reid v. James
Petitioner: Bobby Reed and Bobby Reid
Respondent: Letitia James
Case Number: 6:2022cv06496
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Petitioner must file a response within 30 days after the date of this Order and show cause in writing why his Petition should not be dismissed without prejudice as premature. If Petitioner fails to file a response within 30 days, the Petition will be dismissed without prejudice to filing a petition after he has completely exhausted his state judicial remedies. If the Petition is dismissed because Petitioner failed to file a response to this Order within 30 days, a certificate of appealability will not be issued because Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. See 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2); Lucidore v. N.Y. State Div. of Parole, 209 F.3d 107, 112-13 (2d Cir. 2000). Upon dismissal, the Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith, and in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 1/3/23. (KAP)This was mailed to: Bobby Reid, 21-B-1585 MOHAWK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY Box 8451 Rome, NY 13440.Clerk to Follow up
December 12, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bobby Reid. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 JUDGMENT administratively closing this action. Signed by Clerk on 11/15/22. (JHF)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate the Petition without filing it or assessing a filing fee. Petitioner is granted leave to reopen this case, no later than 30 days from entry of this Order, by submitting either (1) the $5.00 filing fee or (2) a motion to proceed in forma pauperis that establishes Petitioner's inability to pay fees and costs and includes a completed and signed prison certification section. The Clerk of Court is directed to send an in forma pauperis motion form to Petitioner. Upon Petitioner's submission within 30 days of either (1) the $5.00 filing fee or (2) a motion to proceed in forma pauperis that establishes his inability to pay fees and costs and includes a completed prison certification, the Clerk of Court shall reopen this case without further order. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 11/15/22. (KAP)This was mailed to: Bobby Reid, 21-B-1585, MOHAWK CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, Box 8451, Rome, NY 13440.Clerk to Follow up
November 15, 2022 Clerk mailed copy of #3 order, #4 judgment and a motion to proceed in forma pauperis to pro se petitioner. (JHF)
November 10, 2022 Clerk corrected the spelling of Plaintiff's last name from "Reed" to "Reid" per Pro Se Office. (JHF)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bobby Reid. (JHF) Modified on 11/10/2022 (JHF).
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Bobby Reid. (JHF) Modified on 11/10/2022 (JHF).
November 9, 2022 Prisoner Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline mailed to petitioner. (JHF)
November 9, 2022 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bobby Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bobby Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Letitia James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?