Shiloah v. Geico Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Renata Shiloah
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Case Number: 6:2024cv06447
Filed: July 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Archilla, Daniel)
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Renata Shiloah. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph N. Kravec, Jr.)(Kravec, Joseph)
August 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Jamie L. Halavais ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5266931.) by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Daniel Archilla)(Archilla, Daniel)
August 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Dan W. Goldfine ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5266929.) by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Daniel Archilla)(Archilla, Daniel)
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Antonio Vozzolo on behalf of Renata Shiloah (Vozzolo, Antonio)
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER re: #4 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant has filed a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), arguing that the complaint in this matter fails to state a claim on which relief can be granted. Without expressing any view as to the merits of Defendant's motion, the Court will afford Plaintiff an opportunity to file an amended complaint curing the alleged defects in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). If Plaintiff timely files an amended complaint, the Court will deny the pending motion to dismiss without prejudice as moot. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint, Plaintiff must file a response to the motion to dismiss. Plaintiff must file either an amended complaint or a response to the motion to dismiss on or before August 28, 2024. In the event Plaintiff files a response to the motion to dismiss, replies are due on or before September 5, 2024. If additional briefing is filed with respect to the motion to dismiss, the Court will review the papers and determine if oral argument is necessary and, if so, will inform the parties of the date and time. Otherwise, the matter will be deemed submitted and decided on the papers. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 08/08/2024. (KER)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Indemnity Company.. (Archilla, Daniel)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Archilla, Daniel)
August 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by GEICO Indemnity Company. Responses due by 8/21/2024.(Archilla, Daniel)
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order ATTENTION ALL PARTIES OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and/or General Order No. 157 In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (KM)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GEICO Indemnity Company. (LB)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of online civil opening. (LB)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's #ADR webpage and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at #adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov. Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the #ADR Plan and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan.(LB)
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (LB)
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Renata Shiloah of Related Case (Kravec, Joseph)
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Geico Indemnity Company $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5233727, filed by Renata Shiloah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Kravec, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shiloah v. Geico Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais
Represented By: Daniel R. Archilla
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renata Shiloah
Represented By: Joseph N. Kravec, Jr
Represented By: Antonio Vozzolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?