Gilbert, II et al v. Campbelle et al
Plaintiff: Alvin E. Gilbert, II and Neiva Gilbert
Defendant: HL Motor Group Inc. and Richard Anthony Campbelle
Case Number: 6:2024cv06674
Filed: November 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen D Holland
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2025 Filing 10 Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Richard Anthony Campbelle, HL Motor Group Inc. (Choudhury, Ashfaquzzaman)
January 8, 2025 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER reassigning case referral to Magistrate Judge Hon. Colleen D. Holland in place of Hon. Marian W. Payson. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court, on 1/8/25. (JHF)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Mandatory Disclosures due by 1/2/2025. Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 1/18/2025. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 2/18/2025. First Mediation Session due by 3/18/2025. Fact Discovery to be completed by 5/18/2025. Motions to Compel Discovery due by 5/18/2025. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 6/18/2025. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 7/18/2025. Expert Discovery to be completed by 8/1/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2025. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 12/18/2024. (DAF)
December 18, 2024 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 12/18/2024. Scheduling Order to issue. Appearances: Richard A. Plukas, Esq., for plaintiffs; Ashfaquzzaman (Shawn) Choudhury, Esq., for defendants. (DAF)
December 13, 2024 Filing 6 DISCOVERY PLAN by Alvin E. Gilbert, II.(Plukas, Richard)
December 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2024 at 10:40 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Counsel will be provided dial-in instructions by email prior to the conference. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 12/9/2024. (DAF) Modified on 12/9/2024 to reflect change in time (DAF).
December 2, 2024 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marian W. Payson for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 12/2/24. (JHF)
November 25, 2024 ATTENTION ALL PARTIES OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and/or General Order No. 157 In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (KM)
November 20, 2024 Case Assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
November 20, 2024 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's #ADR webpage and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at #adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov. Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the #ADR Plan and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK)
November 20, 2024 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
November 19, 2024 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Notice of Removal. (Choudhury, Ashfaquzzaman)
November 19, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HL Motor Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Choudhury, Ashfaquzzaman)
November 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Supreme Court Monroe County, case number E2024001404. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BNYWDC-5334691), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Verified Answer, #3 Exhibit C- Demand for Statement of Damages Pursuant to CPLR 3017 (c), #4 Exhibit D - Response)(Choudhury, Ashfaquzzaman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert, II et al v. Campbelle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin E. Gilbert, II
Represented By: Richard A. Plukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neiva Gilbert
Represented By: Richard A. Plukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HL Motor Group Inc.
Represented By: Ashfaquzzaman (Shawn) Choudhury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Anthony Campbelle
Represented By: Ashfaquzzaman (Shawn) Choudhury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?