Brown et al v. Todorov et al
Plaintiff: Henry J. Brown and Cora B. Brown
Defendant: Alexander A. Todorov, AirtTime Express, Inc. and AirTime Express USA, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2024cv06676
Filed: November 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Referring Judge: Colleen D Holland
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2025 This case has been consolidated with 24-CV-6575. All future docketing should be done on 24-CV-6575. (JHF)
January 8, 2025 Filing 12 Text Order granting #5 letter requesting consolidation of cases. Defendants in cases 24-cv-6575 and 24-cv-6676 request to have the cases consolidated given the common nucleus of operative facts. None of the Plaintiffs in either case responded to Defendants' request. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42, if the actions before a court involve a common question of law or fact, the Court may consolidate the actions. After reviewing the letter and the facts in the complaints, the Court concludes that the two cases involve common questions of law and fact and therefore, Defendants' request to consolidate the cases is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to consolidate cases 24-cv-6575 and 24-cv-6676 under docket number 24-cv-6575 and to close the case with docket number 24-cv-6676. The parties are directed to file any subsequent documents under case number 24-cv-6575. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 1/8/2025. (EMC)Clerk to Follow up
January 8, 2025 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER reassigning case referral to Magistrate Judge Hon. Colleen D. Holland in place of Hon. Marian W. Payson. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court, on 1/8/25. (JHF)
December 23, 2024 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alexander A. Todorov, AirtTime Express, Inc. (Brodie, James)
December 17, 2024 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Marian W. Payson: Telephone Scheduling Conference not held on 12/17/2024. Appearances: Richard A. Plukas, Esq., for plaintiffs; James P. Brodie, Esq., for defendants. Counsel requests an adjournment of the Telephone Scheduling Conference. The Court grants the request. The Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2024 is adjourned until 1/29/2025 at 11:00 AM. Counsel will be provided dial-in instructions by email prior to the conference. (DAF)
December 17, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kadeem O. Wolliaston, I on behalf of Alexander A. Todorov, AirtTime Express, Inc. (Wolliaston, Kadeem)
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2024 at 11:20 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Counsel will be provided dial-in instructions by email prior to the conference. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 12/4/2024. (DAF)
December 3, 2024 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER re #5 Letter requesting consolidation of cases. Response due 1/2/2025. Reply due 1/9/2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 12/3/2024. (EMC)
December 2, 2024 Case referred to Hon. Marian W. Payson. (JHF)
December 2, 2024 Filing 5 Letter filed by Alexander A. Todorov, AirtTime Express, Inc. requesting cases be consolidated. (Brodie, James)
December 2, 2024 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to refer this case to Hon. Marian W. Payson, United States Magistrate Judge, for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. The parties are encouraged to consider consenting to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Consent forms are available from the chambers of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. The parties may give consent to a Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and enter a final order dispositive of each motion; or such consent may be given for a limited purpose such as the disposition of a particular motion that would otherwise be before the District Judge in the absence of such consent. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 12/2/2024. (EMC)Clerk to Follow up
November 26, 2024 Case transferred to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Hon. Charles J. Siragusa no longer assigned to the case. (JHF)
November 26, 2024 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Honorable Frank P. Geraci, Senior United States District Judge, to whom the related case, 24-CV-6575 FPG is already assigned. (Removing counsel inadvertently failed to note the relatedness when commencing the subject action, but has subsequently filed an Amended Civil Cover Sheet). So Ordered. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 11/26/2024. (MJK)Clerk to Follow up
November 21, 2024 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Alexander A. Todorov, AirtTime Express, Inc., to #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Civil Cover Sheet to include related case to be consolidated. (Brodie, James)
November 20, 2024 Case Assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
November 20, 2024 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
November 20, 2024 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's #ADR webpage and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at #adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov. Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the #ADR Plan and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK)
November 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Air-Time Express, Inc., Alexander Todorov from Monroe County Supreme Court, case number E2024014811. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5335254), filed by Air-Time Express, Inc., Alexander Todorov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Supreme Court Document List, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brodie, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Todorov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry J. Brown
Represented By: Richard A. Plukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora B. Brown
Represented By: Richard A. Plukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander A. Todorov
Represented By: Kadeem O. Wolliaston, I
Represented By: James Patrick Brodie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AirtTime Express, Inc.
Represented By: Kadeem O. Wolliaston, I
Represented By: James Patrick Brodie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AirTime Express USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?