United States of America v. $5,002.00 Seized from Robinhood Markets, Inc. Account Number 578853509 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $5,002.00 Seized from Robinhood Markets, Inc. Account Number 578853509, $10,000.05 Seized from Robinhood Markets, Inc. Account Number 696647072 and $5,005.19 Seized from Robinhood Markets, Inc. Account Number 818393654
Case Number: 6:2025cv06038
Filed: January 16, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Meredith A Vacca
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2025 Filing 6 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(DMK)
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 First MOTION to Seal Document. Signed by Hon. Meredith A. Vacca on 1/29/2025. (DMK)
January 27, 2025 Filing 4 First MOTION to Seal Document Notice of Motion by United States of America.(Palma, Elizabeth)
January 17, 2025 Filing 3 ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. (TMK)
January 17, 2025 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint, Proposed Arrest Warrant In Rem. (Palma, Elizabeth)
January 17, 2025 Case Assigned to Hon. Meredith A. Vacca. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
January 17, 2025 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
January 16, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Forfeiture against All Defendants, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Arrest Warrant in rem, #3 Supplement Arrest Warrant Cover Sheet)(Palma, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $5,002.00 Seized from Robinhood Markets, Inc. Account Number 578853509 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,002.00 Seized from Robinhood Markets, Inc. Account Number 578853509
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,000.05 Seized from Robinhood Markets, Inc. Account Number 696647072
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,005.19 Seized from Robinhood Markets, Inc. Account Number 818393654
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?