Dover et al v. British Airways, PLC (UK)
Plaintiff: Russel Dover, Suzette Perry, Cody Rank and Jonathan Stone
Defendant: British Airways, PLC (UK)
Case Number: 1:2012cv05567
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Margo K. Brodie
Presiding Judge: Marilyn D. Go
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS approved. SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 10/25/2018. (Ramesar, Thameera)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER re 311 - 312 . The Court has received two objections (see ECF Nos. 311 , 312 ). Having reviewed the objections, the Court ORDERS that, in addition to plaintiffs' omnibus response due on July 20, 2018, plaintiffs and the defenda nt shall separately file letter briefs addressing the specific concerns raised in the aforementioned objections by 7/17/2018. Moreover, counsel should be prepared to address the objections at the hearing scheduled for July 27, 2018. It is fu rther ORDERED that Mr. Sauberman's request to appear pro se at the Final Approval Hearing to address the Court is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall redact the Objections as set forth herein and shall post the redacted Objections to the website established for this litigation, along with a copy of this Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/10/2018. (Blase, Brendan)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, Plaintiffs, a class of members of the Executive Club, British Airways' frequent flyer program, allege that the airline breached its frequent flyer contract ("the Contract") by imposing impermissible fuel surcharg es on frequent flyer reward flights. The parties have submitted cross motions for summary judgment. See ECF No. 227 ("BA Mot."), ECF No. 229 (Pls.' Cross-Mot.), ECF No. 232 ("BA Reply"), ECF No. 234 ("Pls.' Reply"). Because triable issues remain, summary judgment is denied. So Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 9/28/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Before the Court is an appeal by British Airways objecting to Magistrate Judge Go's 8/15/14 ruling on British Airways' motion to compel. Magistrate Judge Go's 8/15/14 Order is accordingly affirmed. Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 10/9/2014. (Chee, Alvin)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: The 81 Motion to Compel is denied as set forth in the attached order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 8/15/2014. (Moo-Young, Jillian)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, The defendant's 23 Motion to dismiss is DENIED. So Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 11/7/2013. (Lee, Tiffeny)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dover et al v. British Airways, PLC (UK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Airways, PLC (UK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russel Dover
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Diamand
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Mark Schlachet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzette Perry
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Diamand
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Mark Schlachet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Rank
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Diamand
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Mark Schlachet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Stone
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Diamand
Represented By: Jason Louis Lichtman
Represented By: Mark Schlachet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?