Stillwagon v Innsbrook Golf & Marina, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: William C. Stillwagon
Defendant: Innsbrook Golf & Marina, LLC, Rial Corporation, Alois Rieder and Richard Rieder
Counter_claimant: Rial Corporation and Innsbrook Golf & Marina, LLC
Counter_defendant: William C. Stillwagon
Case Number: 2:2013cv00018
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Northern Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2014 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion to Compel and denying as moot 121 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 4/23/2014. (Sawyer, D.)
August 29, 2014 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 104 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on count one. The Severance Agreement is unenforceable. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/29/2014. (Edwards, S.)
November 12, 2014 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 156 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Plaintiff's Breach of Oral Contract Claim; granting 162 Joint Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summar y Judgment; denying 170 Motion for Reconsideration; and denying 172 Motion to Amend 169 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Motion for Leave to Appeal - The court GRANTS defendants' motion for partial summary judgment on co unt two of plaintiff's second amended complaint. The court also GRANTS defendants' motion to file a supplement to their response to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, DENIES plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, and DENIE S plaintiff's motion to amend the order on motion for partial summary judgment on count one. Finally, the court orders the parties to participate in court-hosted mediation with Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/12/2014. (Tripp, S.)
December 4, 2014 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 180 Motion To Be Excused From Court Ordered Mediation. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 12/3/14. (O'Brien, C.)
December 8, 2014 184 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 12/8/14. (O'Brien, C.)
December 8, 2014 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/8/14. (O'Brien, C.)
February 4, 2015 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 142 Motion to Compel, 148 Motion to Compel, and 150 Motion to Compel; and GRANTING 146 Motion for Order to Show Cause and 152 Motion to Compel. In sum, the court GRANTS IN PART defendants' motions to compel an enlargement of time to depose Stillwagon 142 , to compel responses to defendants' third request for production 148 , and to compel Stillwagon's response to defendants' requests to admit 150 . Furthermore, the cour t GRANTS defendants' motions to show cause 146 and forreimbursement of costs 152 . Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/4/15. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (O'Brien, C.)
May 7, 2015 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING: 190 Joint Motion to Dismiss for consent order . It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, that; 1) The Defendants counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice; 2) All Orders of this Court remain in effect; and 3) The Court retains jurisdiction solely to enforce the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 5/7/2015. (O'Brien, C.)
June 6, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 6/6/2013. (Sawyer, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stillwagon v Innsbrook Golf & Marina, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Stillwagon
Represented By: Charles J. Dangelo
Represented By: David Dreifus
Represented By: Bernard P. Matthews, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innsbrook Golf & Marina, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Cashman
Represented By: Brent O. E. Clinkscale
Represented By: Audrey K. Kwak
Represented By: Johnny M. Loper
Represented By: Mark A. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rial Corporation
Represented By: Michael S. Cashman
Represented By: Brent O. E. Clinkscale
Represented By: Audrey K. Kwak
Represented By: Johnny M. Loper
Represented By: Mark A. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alois Rieder
Represented By: Michael S. Cashman
Represented By: Brent O. E. Clinkscale
Represented By: Johnny M. Loper
Represented By: Mark A. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Rieder
Represented By: Michael S. Cashman
Represented By: Brent O. E. Clinkscale
Represented By: Johnny M. Loper
Represented By: Mark A. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Rial Corporation
Represented By: Michael S. Cashman
Represented By: Brent O. E. Clinkscale
Represented By: Audrey K. Kwak
Represented By: Johnny M. Loper
Represented By: Mark A. Willard
Represented By: Michael S. Cashman
Represented By: Brent O. E. Clinkscale
Represented By: Audrey K. Kwak
Represented By: Johnny M. Loper
Represented By: Mark A. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Innsbrook Golf & Marina, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Cashman
Represented By: Brent O. E. Clinkscale
Represented By: Audrey K. Kwak
Represented By: Johnny M. Loper
Represented By: Mark A. Willard
Represented By: Michael S. Cashman
Represented By: Brent O. E. Clinkscale
Represented By: Audrey K. Kwak
Represented By: Johnny M. Loper
Represented By: Mark A. Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: William C. Stillwagon
Represented By: Charles J. Dangelo
Represented By: Bernard P. Matthews, Jr.
Represented By: Charles J. Dangelo
Represented By: Bernard P. Matthews, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.