United States of America v. Griffin's Personal Property et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Griffin's Personal Property and A 2010 Cadillac CTS
Case Number: 2:2017cv00019
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Northern Division Office
County: PASQUOTANK
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 17 Motion to Strike; and denying 23 Motion. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/23/2018. Copy sent to Harold Griffin atCraven Correctional Institution via US Mail to P.O. Box 839, Vanceboro, NC 28586. (Stouch, L.)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying without prejudice 20 Ex Parte Motion and 21 Ex Parte Motion. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/24/2018. Copy sent to Harold Griffin via US Mail to Craven Correctional Institution P.O. Box 839, Vanceboro, NC 28586. Copy sent to plaintiff via email. (Stouch, L.)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER regarding 12 Motion under Rule G(5)(A) and G(4). The Court construes Griffin's pro se motion [DE 12] as an answer to the complaint for forfeiture in rem pursuant to Rule G(5)(b). Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/3/2017. Copy sent to Harold Griffin via US Mail to 210 Executive Drive, Elizabeth City, NC 27907. (Stouch, L.)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel and denying without prejudice 9 Motion for Entry of Default and 10 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/15/2017. Certified copy sent via US Mail to Harold Griffin, at 210 Executive Dr., Elizabeth City, NC 27909. (Stouch, L.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Griffin's Personal Property et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen A. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin's Personal Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A 2010 Cadillac CTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?