Moore v. Bertie County Board of Education
Plaintiff: Calvin R. Moore
Defendant: Bertie County Board of Education
Case Number: 2:2019cv00022
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response regarding #9 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Response due by 9/16/2019. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/23/2019. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Calvin R. Moore, PO Box 541, Ahoskie, NC 27910.) (Collins, S.)
August 23, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #9 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. (Collins, S.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #9 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Calvin R. Moore. (Collins, S.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk to Calvin Moore regarding Text Order entered this date. (Collins, S.)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - Where defendant has filed a motion to dismiss, good cause appears to delay the parties' scheduling conference activities, and deadline for provision of their joint report and plan, where ordinarily at this juncture the court would trigger these activities in preface to its entry of a case management order through issuance of initial order regarding planning and scheduling. Unless a party raises objection to a stay of these activities, pending completion of briefing on the motion now at issue, and decision thereon by this court, in filing due within 14 days from date of entry of this order, the court will stay that aspect of the case so as to promote focus on the issues raised in defendants' motion. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 7/30/2019. (Collins, S.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Calvin Moore as to #9 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Response due by 8/22/2019. (Collins, S.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support regarding #9 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Bertie County Board of Education. (Shive, Colin)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Bertie County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Index Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit First Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #4 Exhibit Second Charge of Discrimination, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Melody Coons, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Charlene Jones, #7 Exhibit Teacher Performance Appraisal Process, #8 Exhibit Policy 7815) (Shive, Colin)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is reassigned to the Honorable Louise Wood Flanagan, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. United States District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 2:19-cv-22-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/17/2019. Sent to Calvin R. Moore at PO Box 541 Ahoskie, NC 27910 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Colin Alexander Shive on behalf of Bertie County Board of Education. (Shive, Colin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bertie County Board of Education. Summons issued at Greenville intake. (Rudd, D.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Calvin R. Moore. (Rudd, D.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Calvin R. Moore. (Rudd, D.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bertie County Board of Education (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number GRN002204), filed by Calvin R. Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Letter from U.S. Department of Labor Veterans Employment and Training Service, #2 Exhibit B- Summary Evaluation 2013-2014, #3 Exhibit C- Email BHS Evaluation Chart, #4 Exhibit D- Email Missing Evaluations, #5 Exhibit E- Letter by Clara Lee, #6 Exhibit F- Letter dated 4/28/17 to Calvin Moore, #7 Exhibit G- Letter dated 7/10/17 to Calvin Moore, #8 Exhibit H- Bertie County Board of Education Contract for Professional Services, #9 Exhibit I- Letter to Calvin Moore dated 11/14/17 from Retirement Systems Division, #10 Exhibit J- Letter to Calvin Moore dated 4/25/18, #11 Exhibit K- Email from Calvin Moore to Steven Hill dated 4/3/17, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Bertie County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin R. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertie County Board of Education
Represented By: Colin Alexander Shive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?