Henson et al v. National Flood Insurance Program et al
Plaintiff: Frank Lentz Henson and Beverly Sharpe Henson
Defendant: Federal Emerengency Management Agency, FEMA, Department of Homeland Security and National Flood Insurance Program
Case Number: 2:2019cv00029
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 Document: Certified Mail Receipt and USPS Tracking Information filed by Beverly Sharpe Henson, Frank Lentz Henson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to Federal Emerengency Management Agency, FEMA. Summonses issued at intake. (Stouch, L.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 Documents: USPS Return Receipts filed by Beverly Sharpe Henson, Frank Lentz Henson. (Stouch, L.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Service - FEMA filed by Beverly Sharpe Henson, Frank Lentz Henson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service - US Attorney General, #2 Certificate of Service - National Flood Insurance Program, #3 Certificate of Service - US Attorney) (Stouch, L.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Beverly Sharpe Henson, Frank Lentz Henson. (Stouch, L.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Beverly Sharpe Henson (Stouch, L.)
September 23, 2019 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party Frank Lentz Henson has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Stouch, L.)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Plaintiffs regarding Case Filing Deficiencies. Copy sent via US Mail Frank Lentz Henson and Beverly Sharpe Henson, 3401 Smoketree Drive, Greensboro, NC 27410. (Stouch, L.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to National Flood Insurance Program. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Frank Lentz Henson. (Rudd, D.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Frank Lentz Henson. (Rudd, D.)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number RAL0763901), filed by Frank Lentz Henson, Beverly Sharpe Henson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.) Modified on 9/6/2019 (Stouch, L.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henson et al v. National Flood Insurance Program et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emerengency Management Agency, FEMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Flood Insurance Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Lentz Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Sharpe Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?