Howe v. Correction Enterprises et al
Plaintiff: George Howe
Defendant: Robert Leon, Annie Harvey, W David Guice, George Solomon, Frank L Perry, Colbert Respass, Karen Brown, Kenneth Lassiter, Thomas Terranova, Joseph Harrell, Erik A Hooks, Nicole E Sullivan, Correction Enterprises, Fay D Lassiter, Felix Taylor, Regina Ferebee, Captain Marquis Betz, Thomas Ashley, Katina Jordan, Vivian R Johnson, Leon Williams, William Davenport, Jermaine Griffin, Richard Turner, Carlton Richardson, Steven Gardner, Leary M Casper, Jeffrey Baker, Loris Sutton and Jesse Rogers
Case Number: 2:2019cv00036
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Malcolm J Howard
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the word count for Defendants brief in support of their consolidated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint is hereby enlarged to 16,800 words, and Plaintiffs response is correspondingly enlarged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 12/26/2019. (Lee, L.)
December 23, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #39 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Rudd, D.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 39 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Thomas Ashley, Jeffrey Baker, Marquis Betz, Karen Brown, Leary M Casper, Correction Enterprises, William Davenport, Regina Ferebee, Steven Gardner, Jermaine Griffin, W David Guice, Joseph Harrell, Annie Harvey, Erik A Hooks, Vivian R Johnson, Katina Jordan, Fay D Lassiter, Kenneth Lassiter, Robert Leon, Frank L Perry, Colbert Respass, Carlton Richardson, Jesse Rogers, George Solomon, Nicole E Sullivan, Loris Sutton, Felix Taylor, Thomas Terranova, Richard Turner, Leon Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cassell, Shannon)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that the time for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, is hereby extended through and including January 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 12/5/2019. (Rudd, D.)
December 4, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #37 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #29 Amended Complaint. (Rudd, D.)
December 3, 2019 Filing 37 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #29 Amended Complaint,, filed by Thomas Ashley, Jeffrey Baker, Marquis Betz, Karen Brown, Leary M Casper, Correction Enterprises, William Davenport, Regina Ferebee, Steven Gardner, Jermaine Griffin, W David Guice, Joseph Harrell, Annie Harvey, Erik A Hooks, Vivian R Johnson, Katina Jordan, Fay D Lassiter, Kenneth Lassiter, Robert Leon, Frank L Perry, Colbert Respass, Carlton Richardson, Jesse Rogers, George Solomon, Nicole E Sullivan, Loris Sutton, Felix Taylor, Thomas Terranova, Richard Turner, Leon Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cassell, Shannon)
November 20, 2019 Filing 36 Summons Issued as to Richard Turner. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 35 Notice filed by George Howe Proposed Summons. (Edwards, Catharine)
November 18, 2019 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to Steven Gardner, Leon Williams. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
November 18, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #33 Proposed Summons - Counsel is reminded again that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the proposed summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
November 15, 2019 Filing 33 Notice filed by George Howe Proposed Summons for Leon Williams, Stephen Gardner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Stephen Gardner) (Edwards, Catharine) (Main Document 33 and attachment 1 flattened and replaced on 12/2/2019) (Edwards, S.).
November 8, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #32 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including December 15, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint #29 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/8/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
November 8, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Rudd, D.)
November 8, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Thomas Ashley, Jeffrey Baker, Marquis Betz, Karen Brown, Leary M Casper, Correction Enterprises, William Davenport, Regina Ferebee, Steven Gardner, Jermaine Griffin, W David Guice, Joseph Harrell, Annie Harvey, Erik A Hooks, Vivian R Johnson, Katina Jordan, Fay D Lassiter, Kenneth Lassiter, Robert Leon, Frank L Perry, Colbert Respass, Carlton Richardson, Jesse Rogers, George Solomon, Nicole E Sullivan, Loris Sutton, Felix Taylor, Thomas Terranova, Richard Turner, Leon Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Brennan, Stephanie)
November 4, 2019 Filing 31 Notice filed by Karen Brown, Correction Enterprises, Regina Ferebee, W David Guice, Joseph Harrell, Annie Harvey, Erik A Hooks, Fay D Lassiter, Kenneth Lassiter, Robert Leon, Frank L Perry, Colbert Respass, George Solomon, Nicole E Sullivan, Felix Taylor, Thomas Terranova of filing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Cassell, Shannon)
November 4, 2019 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Thomas Ashley, Jeffrey Baker, Marquis Betz, Leary M Casper, William Davenport, Jermaine Griffin, Vivian R Johnson, Katina Jordan, Carlton Richardson, Jesse Rogers, Loris Sutton. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
November 4, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #29 Amended Complaint. Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the proposed summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
November 1, 2019 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by George Howe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for Thomas Ashley, #2 Proposed Summons for Jeffrey Baker, #3 Proposed Summons for Marquis Betz, #4 Proposed Summons for Leary Matthew Casper, #5 Proposed Summons for William Davenport, #6 Proposed Summons for Jermaine Griffin, #7 Proposed Summons for Vivian Johnson, #8 Proposed Summons for Katina Jordan, #9 Proposed Summons for Carlton Richardson, #10 Proposed Summons for Jesse Rogers, #11 Proposed Summons for Loris Sutton) (Edwards, Catharine) (Attachments 1 through 11 flattened and replaced on 11/4/2019) (Edwards, S.).
November 1, 2019 Filing 28 Financial Disclosure Statement by George Howe (Edwards, Catharine)
October 31, 2019 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to Senior United States District Judge Malcolm J. Howard for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 2:19-CV-36-H. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/31/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
October 30, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance filed by David F. Kirby on behalf of George Howe. (Kirby, David)
October 30, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance filed by Winston Scott Kirby on behalf of George Howe. (Kirby, Winston)
October 30, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance filed by Catharine E. Edwards on behalf of George Howe. (Edwards, Catharine)
October 30, 2019 Filing 24 Financial Disclosure Statement by Annie Harvey (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel David F. Kirby, Catharine E. Edwards and Winston S. Kirby of Edwards Kirby, LLP at 3201 Glenwood Ave., Suite 100, Raleigh, NC 27612 mailed via US Mail on October 30, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Annie Harvey. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 Financial Disclosure Statement by Erik A Hooks (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement by Correction Enterprises (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 20 Financial Disclosure Statement by Frank L Perry (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kenneth Lassiter (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 18 Financial Disclosure Statement by George Solomon (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 Financial Disclosure Statement by W David Guice (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by Felix Taylor (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Colbert Respass (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Karen Brown (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by Robert Leon (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Fay D Lassiter (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nicole E Sullivan (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Joseph Harrell (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Regina Ferebee (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Thomas Terranova (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 Notice filed by Karen Brown, Correction Enterprises, Regina Ferebee, W David Guice, Joseph Harrell, Annie Harvey, Erik A Hooks, Fay D Lassiter, Kenneth Lassiter, Robert Leon, Frank L Perry, Colbert Respass, George Solomon, Nicole E Sullivan, Felix Taylor, Thomas Terranova regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Cassell, Shannon)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 Notice filed by Karen Brown, Correction Enterprises, Regina Ferebee, W David Guice, Joseph Harrell, Annie Harvey, Erik A Hooks, Fay D Lassiter, Kenneth Lassiter, Robert Leon, Frank L Perry, Colbert Respass, George Solomon, Nicole E Sullivan, Felix Taylor, Thomas Terranova regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Cover Sheet. (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Terence Steed on behalf of All Defendants. (Steed, Terence)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Shannon John Cassell on behalf of All Defendants. (Cassell, Shannon)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Tamika L. Henderson on behalf of All Defendants. (Henderson, Tamika)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephanie Ann Brennan on behalf of All Defendants. (Brennan, Stephanie)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Pasquotank Superior Court, case number 19 CVS 738. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5163264), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summonses, #4 Exhibit Acceptance of Service - Correction Enterprises, #5 Exhibit Acceptance of Service - Hooks, #6 Exhibit Motion to Shorten Time for Discovery, #7 Exhibit Order Shortening Time, #8 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Interrogatories) (Brennan, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howe v. Correction Enterprises et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Leon
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Harvey
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W David Guice
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Solomon
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank L Perry
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colbert Respass
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Brown
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lassiter
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Terranova
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Harrell
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik A Hooks
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole E Sullivan
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Enterprises
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay D Lassiter
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Taylor
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Ferebee
Represented By: Terence Steed
Represented By: Tamika L. Henderson
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Marquis Betz
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ashley
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katina Jordan
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian R Johnson
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Williams
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Davenport
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermaine Griffin
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Turner
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlton Richardson
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Gardner
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leary M Casper
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Baker
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loris Sutton
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Rogers
Represented By: Shannon John Cassell
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Howe
Represented By: David F. Kirby
Represented By: Catharine E. Edwards
Represented By: Winston Scott Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?