Brewster et al v. Berger et al
Plaintiff: Larry E. Norman, Billy Joe Brewster, Jr., Thomas L. Hill and Thomas W. Hill
Defendant: Phillip E. Berger, David C. Black, Timothy K. Moore, Stella Anderson, Jeff Carmon, Kenneth Raymond, Karen Brinson Bell and Damon Circosta
Intervenor Defendant: Richard R. Crews, Gettys Cohen Jr., Donald Rumph, John Balla, Lilly Nicole Quick, Virginia Walters Brien, Kathleen Barnes, Shawn Rush, Rebecca Harper, Joseph Thomas Gates, David Wright Brown, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Mark S. Peters and Amy Clare Oseroff
Case Number: 2:2019cv00037
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 46 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas W. Hill, Larry E. Norman as to All Defendants. (Hunter, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/2/2019. (Tripp, S.)
November 26, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Collins, S.)
November 26, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas W. Hill, Larry E. Norman. (Hunter, Robert)
November 25, 2019 Filing 43 STATE BOARD'S OPPOSITION regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction CORRECTED filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, David C. Black, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Kenneth Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Harper, Order on Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit B Harper, Opposition to Motion for P.I., #3 Exhibit C Harper, Nov. 20, 2019 Order, #4 Exhibit D, Common Cause, Bell Affidavit, #5 Exhibit E, McCrory v. Harris, Emergency Application, #6 Exhibit F, Alexander, Hearing Transcript) (Brennan, Stephanie) Modified on 11/26/2019 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The court DIRECTS the parties to deliver to the court a courtesy copy of the documents filed by that party, and all outstanding motions and briefs related thereto, including all exhibits and attachments thereto, tabbed by docket entry and exhibit number, but not bound, no later than ten (10) days from the date of the text order, or sooner if possible. Such courtesy copies are to be addressed for delivery to the Honorable Louise W. Flanagan, United States District Court, Eastern District of North Carolina, ATTN: Ms. Sandra Collins, 413 Middle St., New Bern, NC 28560. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/22/2019. (Collins, S.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 42 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #42 ** STATE BOARD'S OPPOSITION regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, David C. Black, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Kenneth Raymond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Order, #2 Exhibit B Intervenor Brief, #3 Exhibit C Order, #4 Exhibit D Bell Aff, #5 Exhibit E Emergency Stay App, #6 Exhibit F Transcript) (Brennan, Stephanie) Modified on 11/22/2019 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.). Modified on 11/26/2019 (Collins, S.).
November 22, 2019 Filing 41 INTERVENORS' MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown, Gettys Cohen Jr., Richard R. Crews, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Joseph Thomas Gates, Rebecca Harper, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Lilly Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Shawn Rush. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Intervenors' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Legislative Transcript, #3 Exhibit B - Legislative Transcript, #4 Exhibit C - Harper Order) (Nkwonta, Uzoma) Modified on 11/22/2019 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
November 22, 2019 Filing 40 INTERVENORS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS #41 AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown, Gettys Cohen Jr., Richard R. Crews, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Joseph Thomas Gates, Rebecca Harper, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Lilly Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Shawn Rush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legislative Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Legislative Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Harper Order) (Nkwonta, Uzoma) Modified on 11/22/2019 (Collins, S.). Modified on 11/22/2019 to create docket entry relationship to #41 and revise docket text. (Collins, S.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Phillip E. Berger, Timothy K. Moore. (Strach, Phillip)
November 19, 2019 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance filed by Amar Majmundar on behalf of Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, David C. Black, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Kenneth Raymond. (Majmundar, Amar)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Intervene as Defendants. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/18/2019. (Collins, S.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephanie Ann Brennan on behalf of Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, David C. Black, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Kenneth Raymond. (Brennan, Stephanie)
November 18, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Daniel F. Jacobson on behalf of John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown, Gettys Cohen Jr., Richard R. Crews, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Joseph Thomas Gates, Rebecca Harper, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Lilly Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Shawn Rush. (Jacobson, Daniel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 34 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #9 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants filed by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas W. Hill, Larry E. Norman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Other filings) (Hunter, Robert)
November 14, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Abha Khanna on behalf of John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown, Gettys Cohen Jr., Richard R. Crews, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Joseph Thomas Gates, Rebecca Harper, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Lilly Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Shawn Rush. (Khanna, Abha)
November 14, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Aria C. Branch on behalf of John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown, Gettys Cohen Jr., Richard R. Crews, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Joseph Thomas Gates, Rebecca Harper, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Lilly Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Shawn Rush. (Branch, Aria)
November 13, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #30 Notice of Special Appearance, #31 Notice of Special Appearance. In future filings, counsel should include the proper judge designation in the case number. The case number should read 2:19-CV-37-FL. No action by counsel required. (Collins, S.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Uzoma N. Nkwonta on behalf of John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown, Gettys Cohen Jr., Richard R. Crews, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Joseph Thomas Gates, Rebecca Harper, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Lilly Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Shawn Rush. (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
November 12, 2019 Filing 30 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Marc E. Elias on behalf of John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown, Gettys Cohen Jr., Richard R. Crews, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Joseph Thomas Gates, Rebecca Harper, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Lilly Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Shawn Rush. (Elias, Marc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, INJUNCTION, AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER SECTION 1983 against All Defendants, filed by Larry E. Norman, Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas L. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit) (Hunter, Robert)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER regarding motion #9 to intervene, motion #16 to amend, and motion #22 for preliminary injunction. The court DIRECTS that any response to the motion to intervene shall be filed on or before November 15, 2019. Any response to the motion for preliminary injunction shall be filed on or before noon on November 22, 2019, and any reply related thereto shall be filed on or before noon on November 26, 2019. Plaintiffs' motion to amend #16 is GRANTED as a matter of right. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint on or before November 15, 2019. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/12/2019. (Collins, S.)
November 12, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #16 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
November 11, 2019 Filing 28 Financial Disclosure Statement by Phillip E. Berger (Riggins, Alyssa)
November 11, 2019 Filing 27 Financial Disclosure Statement by Timothy K. Moore (Riggins, Alyssa)
November 11, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Douglas McKnight on behalf of Phillip E. Berger, Timothy K. Moore. (McKnight, Michael)
November 11, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance filed by Alyssa Riggins on behalf of Phillip E. Berger, Timothy K. Moore. (Riggins, Alyssa)
November 8, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Abha Khanna on behalf of John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown, Gettys Cohen Jr., Richard R. Crews, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Joseph Thomas Gates, Rebecca Harper, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Lilly Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Shawn Rush. (Khanna, Abha)
November 8, 2019 Filing 23 Memorandum in Support regarding #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas L. Hill, Larry E. Norman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Candidates, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Executive Director of State Board, #3 Exhibit 3 - Orders, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Frank Hill, #5 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Bill Brewster, #6 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Carter Wrenn) (Hunter, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas L. Hill, Larry E. Norman. (Hunter, Robert)
November 8, 2019 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for all further proceedings. United States District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 2:19-CV-37-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/8/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE regarding #2 Notice of Related Case, #5 Notice of Related Case filed by Phillip E. Berger, Timothy K. Moore. (Strach, Phillip)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 Financial Disclosure Statement by Thomas L. Hill (Hunter, Robert)
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Order regarding #16 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas L. Hill, Larry E. Norman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails) (Hunter, Robert)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Aria C. Branch on behalf of John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown, Gettys Cohen Jr., Richard R. Crews, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Joseph Thomas Gates, Rebecca Harper, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Lilly Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Shawn Rush. (Branch, Aria)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 DISREGARD. Corrected and re-filed at #18 . Notice of Appearance filed by Aria C. Branch on behalf of John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown, Gettys Cohen Jr., Richard R. Crews, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Joseph Thomas Gates, Rebecca Harper, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Lilly Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Shawn Rush. (Branch, Aria) Modified on 11/6/2019 (Sellers, N.).
November 5, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #16 Motion to Amend/Correct. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(b)(3) and Section V(I)(3) of the CM/ECF Policy and Procedures Manual and Judge Dever's practice preferences, parties must file a proposed order with any non-dispositive motion. Please file a proposed order using the event 'Proposed Order' in the Responses and Replies category and link it back to the motion to which it corresponds. (Sellers, N.)
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas L. Hill, Larry E. Norman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint) (Hunter, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Phillip J. Strach on behalf of Phillip E. Berger, Timothy K. Moore. (Strach, Phillip)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Larry E. Norman, Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas L. Hill. (Hunter, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Larry E. Norman, Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas L. Hill. Phillip E. Berger waiver sent on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020; Timothy K. Moore waiver sent on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Hunter, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Larry E. Norman (Hunter, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr (Hunter, Robert)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support regarding #9 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants filed by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown, Gettys Cohen Jr., Richard R. Crews, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Joseph Thomas Gates, Rebecca Harper, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Lilly Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Shawn Rush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B -- Corman v. Torres, #3 Exhibit C -- Texas v. US) (Ghosh, Narendra)
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants filed by John Balla, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown, Gettys Cohen Jr., Richard R. Crews, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Joseph Thomas Gates, Rebecca Harper, Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Lilly Nicole Quick, Donald Rumph, Shawn Rush. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Proposed Answer) (Ghosh, Narendra)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Narendra K. Ghosh on behalf of Rebecca Harper, Donald Rumph, John Balla, Richard R. Crews, Lilly Nicole Quick, Gettys Cohen Jr., Shawn Rush, Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr., Amy Clare Oseroff, Mark S. Peters, Joseph Thomas Gates, Kathleen Barnes, Virginia Walters Brien, David Wright Brown. (Ghosh, Narendra)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Thomas L. Hill, Larry E. Norman. All Defendants. (Hunter, Robert)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Conrad Boyd Sturges, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Sturges, Conrad)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case filed by Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, David C. Black, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Kenneth Raymond . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Int-Def's Brief Opposing Preliminary Injunction) (Cox, Paul)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul M. Cox on behalf of Stella Anderson, Karen Brinson Bell, David C. Black, Jeff Carmon, Damon Circosta, Kenneth Raymond. (Cox, Paul)
November 1, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Notice of Related Case. All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Sellers, N.)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Notice filed by Billy Joe Brewster, Jr, Thomas L. Hill, Larry E. Norman CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Hunter, Robert)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Related Case filed by REBECCA HARPER . (Jones, Robert)
November 1, 2019 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
November 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
November 1, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
November 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Billy Joe Brewster, Jr., Thomas L. Hill, Larry E. Norman. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5166281.), filed by THOMAS L. HILL, LARRY E. NORMAN, BILLY JOE BREWSTER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit) (Hunter, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewster et al v. Berger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip E. Berger
Represented By: Michael Douglas McKnight
Represented By: Phillip J. Strach
Represented By: Alyssa Riggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Black
Represented By: Paul M. Cox
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy K. Moore
Represented By: Michael Douglas McKnight
Represented By: Phillip J. Strach
Represented By: Alyssa Riggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Anderson
Represented By: Paul M. Cox
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Carmon
Represented By: Paul M. Cox
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Raymond
Represented By: Paul M. Cox
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Brinson Bell
Represented By: Paul M. Cox
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Circosta
Represented By: Paul M. Cox
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Brennan
Represented By: Amar Majmundar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry E. Norman
Represented By: Robert Neal Hunter, Jr.
Represented By: Conrad Boyd Sturges, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Joe Brewster, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Neal Hunter, Jr.
Represented By: Conrad Boyd Sturges, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L. Hill
Represented By: Robert Neal Hunter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Hill
Represented By: Robert Neal Hunter, Jr.
Represented By: Conrad Boyd Sturges, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Richard R. Crews
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Gettys Cohen Jr.
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Donald Rumph
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: John Balla
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Lilly Nicole Quick
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Virginia Walters Brien
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Kathleen Barnes
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Shawn Rush
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Rebecca Harper
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Joseph Thomas Gates
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: David Wright Brown
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Jackson Thomas Dunn Jr.
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Mark S. Peters
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Amy Clare Oseroff
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Marc E. Elias
Represented By: Uzoma N. Nkwonta
Represented By: Daniel F. Jacobson
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Narendra K. Ghosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?